Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-644
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-644
Title:Oklahoma, Petitioner
v.
Floyd Joseph Ball, Jr.
Docketed:November 2, 2021
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Oklahoma
   Case Numbers:(F-2020-54)
   Decision Date:June 3, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 30 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 2, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 23 2021Brief amicus curiae of Chickasaw Nation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 01 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 2, 2021 to December 16, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 02 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 16, 2021.
Dec 16 2021Brief of respondent Floyd J. Ball in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 16 2021Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Floyd J. Ball.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 05 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/21/2022.
Jan 24 2022Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent GRANTED.
Jan 24 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Mithun Mansinghani
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Oklahoma Attorney General
313 NE 21st Street
Oklahoma City, OK 73105

mithun.mansinghani@oag.ok.gov
405-522-4392
Party name: Oklahoma
Attorneys for Respondent
Zachary Charles Schauf
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block, LLP
1099 New York Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ZSchauf@jenner.com
202-639-6000
Party name: Floyd J. Ball
Other
Frank Sharp Holleman IV
    Counsel of Record
Sonosky, Chambers, Sachse, Endreson & Perry, LLP
1425 K Street NW, Suite 600
Washington, DC 20005

fholleman@sonosky.com
2026820240
Party name: Chickasaw Nation

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543