Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-6429 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-6429 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Randall T. Deviney, Petitioner
v.
Florida
Docketed:November 24, 2021
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Florida
   Case Numbers:(SC17-2231)
   Decision Date:May 6, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:August 19, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 17 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 27, 2021)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Dec 21 2021Brief of respondent Florida in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 06 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/21/2022.
Jan 19 2022Reply of petitioner Randall T. Deviney filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 24 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Barbara Jane Busharis
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Public Defender, Second Judicial Circuit
301 S. Monroe St.
Tallahassee, FL 32301

barbara.busharis@flpd2.com
8505675210
Party name: Randall T. Deviney
Attorneys for Respondent
Carolyn M. Snurkowski
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
PL-01 The Capitol
Tallahassee, FL 32399

carolyn.snurkowski@myfloridalegal.com
850-414-3566
Party name: State of Florida

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543