SEARCH TIPS
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 21-6387 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 21-6387 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Richard Barry Randolph, Petitioner
v.
Florida
Docketed:
November 23, 2021
Lower Ct:
Supreme Court of Florida
Case Numbers:
(SC20-287)
Decision Date:
February 4, 2021
Rehearing Denied:
June 22, 2021
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Nov 18 2021
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 23, 2021)
Petition
Appendix
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Proof of Service
Dec 22 2021
Brief of respondent Florida in opposition filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Jan 06 2022
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/21/2022.
Jan 24 2022
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Marie-Louise Samuels Parmer
Counsel of Record
Parmer DeLiberato, P.A.
P.O. Box 18988
Tampa, FL 33679
marie@parmerdeliberato.com
813-732-3321
Party name: Richard Randolph
Attorneys for Respondent
Carolyn M. Snurkowski
Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
PL-01 The Capitol
Tallahassee, FL 32399
carolyn.snurkowski@myfloridalegal.com
850-414-3566
Party name: State of Florida
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##