Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-6344
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-6344
Title:Joseph J. Snyder, Petitioner
v.
Denis R. McDonough, Secretary of Veterans Affairs
Docketed:November 19, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-2168)
   Decision Date:June 9, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:August 24, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 17 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 20, 2021)
PetitionMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisProof of Service
Dec 07 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 20, 2021 to January 19, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 08 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 19, 2022.
Jan 14 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 19, 2022 to February 18, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 18 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 18, 2022.
Feb 18 2022Brief of respondent Denis R. McDonough, Secretary of Veterans Affairs in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Feb 24 2022Waiver of the 14-day waiting period for distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari pursuant to Rule 15.5 filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 03 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/18/2022.
Mar 21 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jennifer Ann Zajac
    Counsel of Record
Paralyzed Veterans of America
801 18th Street NW
Washington, DC 20006

jenniferz@pva.org
760-639-0765
Party name: Joseph J. Snyder, Sr.
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: McDonough, Denis

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543