Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-6331
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-6331
Title:Byron White, Petitioner
v.
Oklahoma
Docketed:November 18, 2021
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Oklahoma
   Case Numbers:(PC-2021-1048)
   Decision Date:October 27, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 04 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 20, 2021)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Dec 30 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/14/2022.
Jan 18 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Byron White370938
P.O. Box 548
16161 Mokkat Rd.
Lexington, OK 73051

Party name: Byron White

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543