Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-6301
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-6301
Title:Travis Wayne Bentley, Petitioner
v.
Oklahoma
Docketed:November 16, 2021
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Oklahoma
   Case Numbers:(PC-2018-743)
   Decision Date:October 1, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 10 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 16, 2021)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Dec 30 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/14/2022.
Jan 18 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Travis Wayne Bentley#585018
Lexington Correctional Center
P.O. Box 260
Lexington, OK 73051

Party name: Travis Wayne Bentley

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543