Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-608
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-608
Title:Oklahoma, Petitioner
v.
Laurie Jean Martin
Docketed:October 26, 2021
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Oklahoma
   Case Numbers:(F-2017-991)
   Decision Date:May 27, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 23 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 26, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 23 2021Brief amicus curiae of Chickasaw Nation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 24 2021Brief of respondent Laurie Jean Martin in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 24 2021Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Laurie Jean Martin.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 08 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/7/2022.
Dec 08 2021Reply of petitioner Oklahoma filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 10 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/14/2022.
Jan 18 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/21/2022.
Jan 24 2022Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent GRANTED.
Jan 24 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Mithun Mansinghani
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Oklahoma Attorney General
313 NE 21st Street
Oklahoma City, OK 73105

mithun.mansinghani@oag.ok.gov
405-522-4392
Party name: Oklahoma
Attorneys for Respondent
Zachary Charles Schauf
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block, LLP
1099 New York Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ZSchauf@jenner.com
202-639-6000
Party name: Laurie Jean Martin
Other
Frank Sharp Holleman IV
    Counsel of Record
Sonosky, Chambers, Sachse, Endreson & Perry, LLP
1425 K Street NW, Suite 600
Washington, DC 20005

fholleman@sonosky.com
2026820240
Party name: Chickasaw Nation

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543