Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-6050
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-6050
Title:James Bongiorno, Petitioner
v.
Drew Hirshfeld, Acting Under Secretary of Commerce for Intellectual Property and Director, United States Patent and Trademark Office
Docketed:October 21, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2020-1835, 2020-1836)
   Decision Date:May 19, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:July 23, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 19 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 22, 2021)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Nov 05 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, James Bongiorno
Blanket Consent
Nov 15 2021Waiver of right of respondent Hirshfeld, Drew to respond filed.
Main Document
Nov 17 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/3/2021.
Dec 06 2021The motion of petitioner for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is denied. Petitioner is allowed until December 27, 2021, within which to pay the docketing fee required by Rule 38(a) and to submit a petition in compliance with Rule 33.1 of the Rules of this Court.
Dec 27 2021Petitioner complied with order of December 6, 2021.
Dec 30 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/14/2022.
Jan 18 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
James BongiornoP.O. Box 1454
Huntington, NY 11743

(631) 357-6643
Party name: James Bongiorno
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Hirshfeld, Drew

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543