Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-6037
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-6037
Title:Brian David Hill, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:October 21, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-7737)
   Decision Date:April 27, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:August 17, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 08 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 22, 2021)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Oct 25 2021Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 28 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/12/2021.
Nov 15 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Brian David Hill310 Forest Street
Apt. 2
Martinsville, VA 24112

276-790-3505
Party name: Brian David Hill
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543