Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-5967
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-5967
Title:Zenon Grzegorczyk, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:October 15, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-3340)
   Decision Date:May 13, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 08 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 15, 2021)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Nov 09 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 15, 2021 to December 15, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 10 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 15, 2021.
Dec 01 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 15, 2021 to January 14, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 02 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including January 14, 2022.
Jan 03 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 14, 2022 to February 11, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 04 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 11, 2022.
Feb 07 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 11, 2022 to March 11, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 08 2022Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including March 11, 2022.
Mar 11 2022Brief of respondent United States filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Mar 30 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/14/2022.
Apr 18 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/22/2022.
Apr 25 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/29/2022.
May 09 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/12/2022.
May 16 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/19/2022.
May 23 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/26/2022.
May 31 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/2/2022.
Jun 06 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/9/2022.
Jun 13 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/16/2022.
Jun 21 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/23/2022.
Jun 29 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/29/2022.
Jun 30 2022Petition DENIED. Statement of Justice Kavanaugh, with whom The Chief Justice, Justice Thomas, Justice Alito, and Justice Barrett join, respecting the denial of certiorari. (Detached Opinion) Justice Sotomayor, with whom Justice Breyer, Justice Kagan, and Justice Gorsuch join, dissenting from the denial of a grant, vacate, and remand order. (Detached Opinion)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Colleen McNichols Ramais
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Federal Public Defender
300 W. Main St.
Urbana, IL 61801

colleen_ramais@fd.org
2173730666
Party name: Zenon Grzegorczyk
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543