Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-594
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-594
Title:Alphabet Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Rhode Island, Office of the Rhode Island Treasurer on Behalf of the Employees' Retirement System of Rhode Island
Docketed:October 25, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-15638)
   Decision Date:June 16, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:July 23, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 21 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 24, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 16 2021Waiver of right of respondents Rhode Island, Office of the Rhode Island to respond filed.
Main Document
Nov 23 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/10/2021.
Nov 24 2021Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 01 2021Response Requested. (Due January 3, 2022)
Dec 13 2021Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 24 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 3, 2022 to February 2, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 27 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 2, 2022.
Feb 02 2022Brief of respondent Rhode Island, Office of the Rhode Island Treasurer on Behalf of the Employees' Retirement System of Rhode Island in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 16 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/4/2022.
Feb 16 2022Reply of petitioners Alphabet Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 07 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Catherine Emily Stetson
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 13th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20004-1109

cate.stetson@hoganlovells.com
2026375491
Party name: Alphabet Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
David C. Frederick
    Counsel of Record
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.
1615 M Street, NW, Suite 400
Washington, DC 20036-3209

dfrederick@kellogghansen.com
202-326-7900
Party name: Rhode Island, Office of the Rhode Island Treasurer on Behalf of the Employees' Retirement System of Rhode Island
Jason A. ForgeRobbins Geller Rudman & Dowd
655 W. Broadway, Suite 1600
San Diego, CA 92101

jforge@rgrdlaw.com
619-338-1058
Party name: Rhode Island, Office of the Rhode Island Treasurer on Behalf of the Employees' Retirement System of Rhode Island
Other
Lyle Roberts
    Counsel of Record
Shearman & Sterling LLP
401 9th Street, NW
Suite 800
Washington, DC 20004

lyle.roberts@shearman.com
202 508-8108
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Sullivan & Cromwell LLP
1700 New York Ave NW
Washington, DC 20006

wallj@sullcrom.com
(202) 956-7500
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543