Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-5903
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-5903
Title:Angela Johnson, et al., Petitioners
v.
United States
Docketed:October 5, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2021-1083)
   Decision Date:January 21, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 20 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 4, 2021)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Oct 22 2021Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 28 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/12/2021.
Nov 15 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Angela Johnson24 Revere 13
Jackson, TN 38305

Party name: Angela Johnson, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543