Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-5728
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-5728
Title:Alberto Solar-Somohano, Petitioner
v.
Drew Hirshfeld, Acting Under Secretary of Commerce for Intellectual Property and Director, United States Patent and Trademark Office
Docketed:September 21, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2021-1578)
   Decision Date:April 20, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:June 8, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 07 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 21, 2021)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Sep 24 2021Waiver of right of respondent Hirshfeld, Andrew to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 30 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/15/2021.
Oct 18 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Alberto Solar-Somohano4741 NW 5th Street
Miami, FL 33126

(561) 595-8547
Party name: Alberto Solar-Somohano
Attorneys for Respondent
Brian H. Fletcher
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Hirshfeld, Andrew

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543