Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-5726
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-5726
Title:Dexter Earl Kemp, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:September 20, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-10958)
   Decision Date:May 25, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 16 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 20, 2021)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixOtherProof of Service
Oct 12 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 20, 2021 to November 19, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 13 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 19, 2021.
Nov 12 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 19, 2021 to December 3, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 15 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including December 3, 2021.
Dec 03 2021Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 07 2021Waiver of the 14-day waiting period under 15.5 filed.
Main Document
Dec 09 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/7/2022.
Dec 09 2021Reply of petitioner Dexter Earl Kemp filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 10 2022Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED.
Feb 04 2022Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner Dexter Earl Kemp.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 22 2022Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner GRANTED.
Feb 22 2022Brief of petitioner Dexter Earl Kemp filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 01 2022Brief amicus curiae of New Civil Liberties Alliance filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 15 2022ARGUMENT SET FOR Tuesday, April 19, 2022.
Mar 16 2022Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 11th Circuit.
Mar 17 2022The record from the U.S.C.A. 11th Circuit is electronic and located on PACER.
Mar 17 2022The record from the U.S.D.C. Southern Dist. of Florida (Miami) is electronic and located on Pacer.
Mar 23 2022CIRCULATED
Mar 24 2022Brief of respondent United States filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 08 2022Reply of petitioner Dexter Earl Kemp filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 19 2022Argued. For petitioner: Andrew L. Adler, Assistant Federal Public Defender, Ft. Lauderdale, Fla. For respondent: Benjamin W. Snyder, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C.
Jun 13 2022Adjudged to be AFFIRMED. Thomas, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Roberts, C. J., and Breyer, Alito, Sotomayor, Kagan, Kavanaugh, and Barrett, JJ., joined. Sotomayor, J., filed a concurring opinion. Gorsuch, J., filed a dissenting opinion.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Andrew Lee Adler
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender's Office
One East Broward Blvd.
Suite 1100
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

andrew_adler@fd.org
954-536-7436
Party name: Dexter Earl Kemp
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America
Other
Margaret Ann Little
    Counsel of Record
New Civil Liberties Alliance
1225 19th St. NW, Suite 450
Washington, DC 20036

peggy.little@ncla.onmicrosoft.com
2028695212
Party name: New Civil Liberties Alliance

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543