Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-57
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-57
Title:Levi Frasier, Petitioner
v.
Christopher L. Evans, et al.
Docketed:July 15, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1015)
   Decision Date:March 29, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 08 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 16, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 21 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Levi Frasier
Blanket ConsentProof of Service
Aug 06 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 16, 2021 to September 30, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 09 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 30, 2021.
Aug 13 2021Brief amici curiae of First Amendment Scholars filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 13 2021Brief amici curiae of Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and 44 Media Organizations filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 13 2021Brief amici curiae of Legal Scholars of Qualified Immunity filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 13 2021Brief amicus curiae of The Rutherford Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 16 2021Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Justice filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 16 2021Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 16 2021Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 27 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 30, 2021 to October 7, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 28 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including October 7, 2021.
Oct 07 2021Brief of respondents Christopher Evans, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 13 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/29/2021.
Oct 13 2021Reply of petitioner Levi Frasier filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 01 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jeffrey L. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Stanford Law School Supreme Court Litigation Clinic
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305-8610

jlfisher@law.stanford.edu
(650) 724-7081
Party name: Levi Frasier
Attorneys for Respondents
Kristin M. Bronson
    Counsel of Record
Denver City Attorney's Office
201 W Colfax Ave. Dept. 1108
Denver, CO 80202

kristin.bronson@denvergov.org
7209133107
Party name: Christopher Evans, et al.
Wendy J. SheaDenver City Attorney's Office
201 W. Colfax Avenue
Department 1108
Denver, CO 80202-5332

wendy.shea@denvergov.org
7209133112
Party name: Christopher Evans, et al.
Other
William Robert Aronin
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Justice
901 North Glebe Road, Suite 900
Arlington, VA 22203

waronin@ij.org
(703) 682-9320
Party name: Institute for Justice
Bruce David Brown
    Counsel of Record
Reporters Committee for Freedom of Press
1156 15th Street NW, Suite 1020
Washington, DC 20005

bbrown@rcfp.org
2027959300
Party name: Reporters Committee for Freedom of the Press and 44 Media Organizations
Alan Keith Chen
    Counsel of Record
2255 E. Evans Avenue
Room 455E
Denver, CO 80208

achen@law.du.edu
303-871-6283
Party name: Legal Scholars of Qualified Immunity
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center
Jay Remington Schweikert
    Counsel of Record
The Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20001

jschweikert@cato.org
2022161461
Party name: Cato Institute
Kristina Renee Van Bockern
    Counsel of Record
Holland & Hart LLP
555 17th Street, Suite 3200
Denver, CO 80202

trvanbockern@hollandhart.com
720-206-7493
Party name: First Amendment Scholars
John W. Whitehead
    Counsel of Record
The Rutherford Institute
109 Deerwood Road
Charlottesville, VA 22911

legal@rutherford.org
4349783888
Party name: The Rutherford Institute

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543