Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-5681
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-5681
Title:Joe Johnson, Jr., Petitioner
v.
Oklahoma
Docketed:September 15, 2021
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Oklahoma
   Case Numbers:(PC-2018-343)
   Decision Date:August 25, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 08 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 15, 2021)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Oct 28 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/12/2021.
Nov 15 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Joe Johnson Jr.096004
Joseph Harp Correctional Center
P.O. Box 548
Lexington, OK 73051

Party name: Joe Johnson

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543