Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-560
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-560
Title:Dakota Access, LLC, Petitioner
v.
Standing Rock Sioux Tribe, et al.
Docketed:October 18, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-5197, 20-5201)
   Decision Date:January 26, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:April 23, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 20 2021Motion (21M31) for leave to file a petition for a writ of certiorari with the supplemental appendix under seal filed.
Sep 20 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 17, 2021)
PetitionAppendixAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 29 2021MOTION (21M31) DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/15/2021.
Oct 18 2021Motion (21M31) for leave to file a petition for a writ of certiorari with the supplemental appendix under seal Granted. Justice Alito and Justice Kavanaugh took no part in the consideration or decision of this motion.
Nov 10 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 17, 2021 to December 17, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 12 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 17, 2021, for all respondents.
Nov 16 2021Motion of the Solicitor General to extend the time to file a response from November 17, 2021 to December 17, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 17 2021Brief amici curiae of American Fuel & Petrochemical Manufacturers, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 18 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 17, 2021, for all respondents.
Dec 16 2021Brief of respondents Standing Rock Sioux Tribe, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 17 2021Brief of Federal respondent in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 04 2022Reply of petitioner Dakota Access, LLC filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 05 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/21/2022.
Jan 19 2022Rescheduled.
Feb 11 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/18/2022.
Feb 22 2022Petition DENIED. Justice Alito and Justice Kavanaugh took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Miguel A. Estrada
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

mestrada@gibsondunn.com
202-955-8500
Party name: Dakota Access, LLC
Attorneys for Respondents
Nicole E. Ducheneaux
    Counsel of Record
Big Fire Law & Policy Group
1905 Harney Street
Suite 300
Omaha, NE 68102

nducheneaux@bigfirelaw.com
531-466-8725
Party name: Cheyenne River Sioux Tribe, et al.
Jan Erik Hasselman
    Counsel of Record
Earthjustice
810 Third Avenue
Suite 610
Seattle, WA 98104

jhasselman@earthjustice.org
(206) 343-7340
Party name: Standing Rock Sioux Tribe, et al.
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
David H. Coburn
    Counsel of Record
Steptoe & Johnson LLP
1330 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036

dcoburn@steptoe.com
202-429-3000
Party name: American Fuel & Petrochemical Manufacturers, American Petroleum Institute, Association of Oil Pipe Lines and National Association of Convenience Stores

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543