Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-537
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-537
Title:Adir International, LLC, et al., Petitioners
v.
Starr Indemnity and Liability Company
Docketed:October 13, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-56320)
   Decision Date:April 15, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:May 28, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 08 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 12, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 19 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 12, 2021 to December 13, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 20 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 13, 2021.
Nov 12 2021Brief amici curiae of New Civil Liberties Alliance and the Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 12 2021Brief amici curiae of Landmark Legal Foundation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 13 2021Brief of respondent Starr Indemnity and Liability Co. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 27 2021Reply of petitioners Adir International, LLC, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 29 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/14/2022.
Jan 18 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Michael W. McConnell
    Counsel of Record
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC
650 Page Mill Road
Palo Alto, CA 94304

mmcconnell@wsgr.com
650-493-9300
Party name: Adir International, LLC, et al.
Other
Matthew Conrad Forys
    Counsel of Record
Landmark Legal Foundation
19415 Deerfield Avenue, Suite 312
Leesburg, VA 20176

matt@landmarklegal.org
703-554-6100
Party name: Landmark Legal Foundation, National Federation of Independent Business Small Business Legal Center, Atlantic Legal Foundation, Young America’s Foundation, Hispanic Leadership Fund
Richard A. Samp
    Counsel of Record
New Civil Liberties Alliance
1225 19th Street NW, Suite 450
Washington, DC 20036

rasamp@verizon.net
202-869-5210
Party name: New Civil Liberties Alliance, Cato Institute

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543