Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-5261
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-5261
Title:Shakeel Kahn, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:July 29, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-8054)
   Decision Date:February 25, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 26 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 30, 2021)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Aug 24 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 30, 2021 to September 29, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 25 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 29, 2021.
Sep 29 2021Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Oct 12 2021Reply of petitioner Shakeel Kahn filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 14 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/29/2021.
Nov 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/5/2021.
Nov 05 2021Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. The petition for a writ of certiorari in No. 20-1410 is granted. The cases are consolidated, and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument.
Nov 05 2021Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 20-1410. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 20-1410. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the filing is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.”

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Beau B. Brindley
    Counsel of Record
The Law Offices of Beau B. Brindley
53 W. Jackson Blvd.
Suite 1410
Chicago, IL 60604

bbbrindley@gmail.com
3127658878
Party name: Shakeel Kahn
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543