Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-526
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-526
Title:Uber Technologies, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Damaris Rosales
Docketed:October 8, 2021
Lower Ct:Court of Appeal of California, Second Appellate District
   Case Numbers:(B305546)
   Decision Date:April 30, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:August 11, 2021

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 06 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 8, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 29 2021Waiver of right of respondent Damaris Rosales to respond filed.
Main Document
Nov 09 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/3/2021.
Nov 10 2021Response Requested. (Due December 10, 2021)
Nov 23 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 10, 2021 to January 10, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 24 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 10, 2022.
Jan 10 2022Letter dated January 10, 2022 from counsel for respondent filed.
Main Document
Jan 12 2022Letter dated January 12, 2022 from counsel for petitioner filed.
Main Document
Jan 26 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/18/2022.
Jun 21 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/23/2022.
Jun 27 2022Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Viking River Cruises, Inc. v. Moriana, 596 U. S. ___ (2022).
Jul 29 2022JUDGMENT ISSUED

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Theane Evangelis Kapur
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
333 South Grand Avenue
48th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90071

tevangelis@gibsondunn.com
213.229.7000
Party name: Uber Technologies, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
Deepak Gupta
    Counsel of Record
Gupta Wessler PLLC
2001 K Street NW
Suite 850 North
Washington, DC 20006

deepak@guptawessler.com
(202) 888-1741
Party name: Damaris Rosales
Michael Alexander GoldGOLD APLC
10940 Wilshire Blvd. Floor 16
Los Angeles, CA 90024

mgold@goldaplc.com
323-936-0540
Party name: Damaris Rosales

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543