Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-522
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-522
Title:Michael Simko, Petitioner
v.
United States Steel Corporation
Docketed:October 8, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-1091)
   Decision Date:March 29, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:May 11, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 06 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 8, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 14 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 8, 2021 to December 8, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 15 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 8, 2021.
Dec 08 2021Brief of respondent United States Steel Corp. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 21 2021Reply of petitioner Michael Simko filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 22 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/7/2022.
Jan 10 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
John E. Egers Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Julian Law Firm
71 North Main Street
Washington, PA 15301

johnegers@julianlawfirm.com
814-442-3455
Party name: Michael Simko
Attorneys for Respondent
Leon F. DeJulius Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
250 Vesey Street
New York, NY 10281-1047

lfdejulius@jonesday.com
(212) 326-3939
Party name: United States Steel Corp.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543