Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-520
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-520
Title:Gerald H. Hawkins, Individually and as a Trustee of the CN Hawkins Trust and Gerald H. Hawkins and Carol H. Hawkins Trust, et al., Petitioners
v.
Deb Haaland, Secretary of the Interior, et al.
Docketed:October 8, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-5074)
   Decision Date:March 19, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:May 10, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 05 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 8, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 14 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, Gerald H. Hawkins, et al.
Blanket Consent
Oct 27 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 8, 2021 to December 8, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 28 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 8, 2021.
Nov 08 2021Brief amicus curiae of Oregon Farm Bureau filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 06 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 8, 2021 to January 7, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 07 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including January 7, 2022.
Dec 22 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 7, 2022 to February 10, 2022, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 27 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 10, 2022.
Feb 10 2022Brief of respondents Deb Haaland, Secretary of the Interior, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Feb 25 2022Reply of petitioners Gerald H. Hawkins, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 02 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/18/2022.
Mar 21 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Damien Michael Schiff
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
555 Capitol Mall, Suite 1290
Sacramento, CA 95814

dschiff@pacificlegal.org
(916) 419-7111
Party name: Gerald H. Hawkins, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Deb Haaland, Secretary of the Interior, et al.
Other
Paul J. Beard II
    Counsel of Record
FisherBroyles LLP
4470 W. Sunset Blvd.
Suite 93165
Los Angeles, CA 90027

paul.beard@fisherbroyles.com
818-216-3988
Party name: Oregon Farm Bureau

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543