Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-516
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-516
Title:Justin Haggerty, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:October 7, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-50203)
   Decision Date:May 7, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 04 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 8, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 03 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 8, 2021 to December 8, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 04 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 8, 2021.
Dec 08 2021Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 21 2021Reply of petitioner Justin Haggerty filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 22 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/7/2022.
Jan 10 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jeffrey T. Green
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin
1501 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

jgreen@sidley.com
202 736 8291
Party name: Justin Haggerty
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543