Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-514
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-514
Title:Robert Bello, Petitioner
v.
Rockland County, New York, et al.
Docketed:October 6, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-1879)
   Decision Date:May 5, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 04 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 5, 2021)
PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 06 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Robert Bello
Blanket Consent
Oct 20 2021Waiver of right of respondent Rockland County, New York, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 27 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/12/2021.
Nov 15 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Amy L. Bellantoni
    Counsel of Record
The Bellantoni Law Firm, PLLC
Overhill Road, Suite 400
Scardale, NY 10583

abell@bellantoni-law.com
914-367-0090
Party name: Robert Bello
Attorneys for Respondents
Robert Benjamin Weissman
    Counsel of Record
Saretsky Katz & Dranoff, LLP
565 Taxter Road, Suite 210
Elmsford, NY 10523

rweissman@skdllp.com
2129739797
Party name: Rockland County, New York, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543