Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-513
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-513
Title:Australian Leather Pty. Ltd., et al., Petitioners
v.
Deckers Outdoor Corporation
Docketed:October 6, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2020-2166)
   Decision Date:May 7, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 04 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 5, 2021)
PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 05 2021Brief amicus curiae of Government of the Commonwealth of Australia filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 16 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/3/2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Seth P. Waxman
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
1875 Pennsylvania Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20006

Seth.Waxman@wilmerhale.com
202-663-6800
Party name: Australian Leather Pty. Ltd., et al.
Other
Donald I Baker
    Counsel of Record
Baker & Miller PLLC
2401 Pennsylvania Ave, NW
Suite 300
Washington, DC 20037

dbaker@bakerandmiller.com
202-663-7820
Party name: Government of the Commonwealth of Australia

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543