Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-5095 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-5095 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Melissa Elizabeth Lucio, Petitioner
v.
Bobby Lumpkin, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division
Docketed:July 13, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-70027)
   Decision Date:February 9, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 09 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 12, 2021)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 19 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 12, 2021 to September 13, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 20 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 13, 2021.
Aug 11 2021Brief amici curiae of The Innocence Project and Innocent Network filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 11 2021Brief amici curiae of Former Prosecutors, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 13 2021Brief of respondent Bobby Lumpkin in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 28 2021Reply of petitioner Melissa Elizabeth Lucio filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 30 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/15/2021.
Oct 18 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Allen Richard Ellis
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of A. Richard Ellis
75 Magee Ave.
Mill Valley, CA 94941

a.r.ellis@att.net
415-389-6771
Party name: Melissa Elizabeth Lucio
Attorneys for Respondent
Judd Edward Stone II
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

judd.stone@oag.texas.gov
512-936-1700
Party name: Bobby Lumpkin
Other
Sandra L. Babcock
    Counsel of Record
Cornell Law School
157 Hughes Hall
Ithaca, NY 14853

slb348@cornell.edu
(607) 255-5278
Party name: Former Prosecutors, Anti-Violence Organizations, and Experts in the Field of Gender-Based Violence
Benjamin Gruenstein
    Counsel of Record
Cravath, Swaine & Moore LLP
Worldwide Plaza
825 Eighth Avenue
New York, NY 10019

bgruenstein@cravath.com
2124741000
Party name: The Innocence Project and Innocent Network

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543