Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-5093 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-5093 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Stephen Dale Barbee, Petitioner
v.
Texas
Docketed:July 15, 2021
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Texas
   Case Numbers:(WR-71,070-03)
   Decision Date:February 10, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 12 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 16, 2021)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 04 2021Brief of respondent Texas in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 18 2021Reply of petitioner Stephen Dale Barbee filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 19 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/27/2021.
Oct 04 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Allen Richard Ellis
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of A. Richard Ellis
75 Magee Ave.
Mill Valley, CA 94941

a.r.ellis@att.net
415-389-6771
Party name: Stephen Dale Barbee
Attorneys for Respondent
Steven Waller Conder
    Counsel of Record
Tarrant County Criminal District Attorney's Office
401 W. Belknap
Fort Worth, TX 76196-0201

sconder@tarrantcountytx.gov
817-884-1687
Party name: Texas

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543