Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-507
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-507
Title:Lawyers United Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
United States, et al.
Docketed:October 6, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-5269)
   Decision Date:March 15, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:May 5, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 01 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 5, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 07 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Lawyers United Inc., et al.
Blanket Consent
Oct 20 2021Supplemental brief of petitioners Lawyers United Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 25 2021Blanket Consent filed by Respondents, United States, et al.
Blanket Consent
Nov 04 2021Waiver of right of respondent United States, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Nov 05 2021Brief amicus curiae of SarkarLaw filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 05 2021Brief amicus curiae of Herbert Detrick filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 09 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/3/2021.
Nov 12 2021Second supplemental brief of petitioners Lawyers United Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 06 2021Petition DENIED.
Jan 03 2022Petition for Rehearing filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 12 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/18/2022.
Jan 25 2022Notice of Related Cases Presenting the Same Question Presented and Request for Conferencing Them At the Same Time of Lawyers United Inc., et al. submitted.
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Joseph Robert Giannini
    Counsel of Record
12016 Wilshire Blvd.
#5
Los Angeles, CA 90025

j.r.giannini@verizon.net
3108041814
Party name: Lawyers United Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States, et al.
Other
Herbert Howard Detrick II
    Counsel of Record
2 Elm Road
Etna, NH 03750

hdetrick@att.net
917-455-7815
Party name: Herbert Detrick
Julian Sarkar
    Counsel of Record
SarkarLaw
345 Franklin Street
San Francisco, CA 94102

jsarkar@sarkar.law
4157958795
Party name: SarkarLaw

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543