Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-5050 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-5050 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Kristopher Love, Petitioner
v.
Texas
Docketed:July 9, 2021
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Texas
   Case Numbers:(AP-77,085)
   Decision Date:April 14, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 01 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 9, 2021)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendix
Jul 14 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 9, 2021 to September 8, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 15 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 8, 2021.
Sep 08 2021Brief of respondent Texas in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 23 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/8/2021.
Oct 04 2021Record Requested.
Oct 26 2021Record received from the Texas Court of Criminal Appeals (1 envelope). The record is electronic and contains sealed materials.
Nov 10 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/3/2021.
Nov 16 2021Record Requested - Additional materials requested from the Texas Court of Criminal Appeals.
Nov 19 2021Additional record materials received from the Texas Court of Criminal Appeals.
Dec 09 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/7/2022.
Jan 10 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/14/2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
John Gregory Tatum
    Counsel of Record
John Tatum, Attorney at Law
Walnut Glen Tower - 1190
8144 Walnut Hill Lane - 1190
Dallas, TX 75231

jtatumlaw@gmail.com
12145073455
Party name: Kristopher Love
Attorneys for Respondent
Jaclyn O'Connor Lambert
    Counsel of Record
Dallas County District Attorney's Office
133 N. Riverfront Blvd.
LB-19
Dallas, TX 75207-4399

joconnor@dallascounty.org
214-653-7928
Party name: The State of Texas

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543