Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-505
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-505
Title:Bank of America Corporation, et al., Petitioners
v.
Fund Liquidation Holdings LLC, as Assignee and Successor-in-Interest to FrontPoint Asian Event Driven Fund L.P., et al.
Docketed:October 5, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-2719)
   Decision Date:March 17, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:May 6, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 01 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 4, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 26 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 4, 2021 to December 10, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 27 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part and the time is extended to and including December 8, 2021.
Nov 04 2021Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 04 2021Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Pratik Arvind Shah
    Counsel of Record
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld, LLP
2001 K Street N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

pshah@akingump.com
202-887-4210
Party name: Oversea-Chinese Banking Corporation Limited
Attorneys for Respondents
Eric F. Citron
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein & Russell, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Ave., Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

ecitron@goldsteinrussell.com
(202) 362-0636
Party name: Fund Liquidation Holdings LLC, as assignee and successor-in-interest to FrontPoint Asian Event Driven Fund L.P., on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated, Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd., et al.
Other
Cory L. Andrews
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

candrews@wlf.org
2025880302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation
Gregory George Garre
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins LLP
555 11th Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004

gregory.garre@lw.com
202-637-2207
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543