Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-499
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-499
Title:Carlos Vega, Petitioner
v.
Terence B. Tekoh
Docketed:October 4, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-56414)
   Decision Date:January 15, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:June 3, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 01 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 3, 2021)
PetitionOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 29 2021Waiver of right of respondent Terence B. Tekoh to respond filed.
Main Document
Nov 02 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/19/2021.
Nov 03 2021Brief amici curiae of International Municipal Lawyers Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 03 2021Brief amici curiae of Arizona, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 03 2021Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Police Organizations filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 04 2021Response Requested. (Due December 6, 2021)
Dec 06 2021Brief of respondent Terence B. Tekoh in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 22 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/7/2022.
Dec 22 2021Reply of petitioner Carlos Vega filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 10 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/14/2022.
Jan 14 2022Petition GRANTED.
Feb 16 2022Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Terence B. Tekoh
Blanket ConsentProof of Service
Feb 16 2022Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Carlos Vega
Blanket Consent
Feb 28 2022Brief of petitioner Carlos Vega filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 28 2022Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 07 2022Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 07 2022Brief amici curiae of Local Government Organizations (IMLA) filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 07 2022Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Police Organizations filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 07 2022Brief amici curiae of Arizona, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 08 2022Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae, for divided argument, and for enlargement of time for oral argument filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Mar 15 2022ARGUMENT SET FOR Wednesday, April 20, 2022.
Mar 16 2022Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit.
Mar 17 2022The record from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit is electronic and located on Pacer, with the exception of one Sealed document that has been electronically filed.
Mar 23 2022CIRCULATED
Mar 30 2022Brief of respondent Terence B. Tekoh filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 04 2022Brief amici curiae of California Attorneys for Criminal Justice and Professor Charles D. Weisselberg filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 06 2022Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 06 2022Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 06 2022Brief amici curiae of False Confession and Wrongful Conviction Scholars filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 06 2022Brief amici curiae of The American Civil Liberties Union and Cato Institute filed. (Distributed)
Certificate of Word CountProof of ServiceMain Document
Apr 06 2022Brief amici curiae of Historians of Criminal Procedure filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 06 2022Brief amicus curiae of The National Police Accountability Project filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 08 2022Reply of petitioner Carlos Vega filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 14 2022Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae, for divided argument, and for enlargement of time for oral argument GRANTED.
Apr 20 2022Argued. For petitioner: Roman Martinez, Washington, D. C.; and Vivek Suri, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.) For respondent: Paul L. Hoffman, Hermosa Beach, Cal.
Jun 23 2022Judgment REVERSED and case REMANDED. Alito, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Roberts, C. J., and Thomas, Gorsuch, Kavanaugh, and Barrett, JJ., joined. Kagan, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Breyer and Sotomayor, JJ., joined.
Jul 25 2022JUDGMENT ISSUED

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Roman Martinez V
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins, LLP
555 Eleventh Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004

roman.martinez@lw.com
202-637-3377
Party name: Carlos Vega
Attorneys for Respondent
Paul Lindsey Hoffman
    Counsel of Record
Schonbrun Seplow Harris Hoffman & Zeldes LLP
200 Pier Ave.
Suite 226
Hermosa Beach, CA 90254

hoffpaul@aol.com
3107177373
Party name: Terence B. Tekoh
Other
Steven Edwards Art
    Counsel of Record
Loevy & Loevy
311 N. Aberdeen St., 3rd Fl.
Chicago, IL 60607

steve@loevy.com
312-243-5900
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers
James Patrick Davy
    Counsel of Record
All Rise Trial & Appellate
P.O. Box 15216
Philadelphia, PA 19125

jimdavy@allriselaw.org
(215) 792-3579
Party name: The National Police Accountability Project
Drew Curtis Ensign
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
2005 N. Central Avenue
Phoenix, AZ 85004

drew.ensign@azag.gov
602-542-5025
Party name: Arizona, Alabama, Arkansas, Florida, Georgia, Idaho, Indiana, Kansas, Kentucky, Louisiana, Mississippi, Missouri, Montana, Nebraska, Ohio, Oklahoma, South Carolina, South Dakota, Tennessee, Texas, Utah, and West Virginia
Drew Curtis Ensign
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
2005 N. Central Avenue
Phoenix, AZ 85004

drew.ensign@azag.gov
602-542-5025
Party name: State of Arizona, et al.
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center
Jeffrey Matthew Harris
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
1600 Wilson Blvd.
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22209

jeff@consovoymccarthy.com
202-321-4120
Party name: National Association of Police Organizations
Brett Max Kaufman
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
125 Broad Street, 18th Floor
New York, NY 10004

bkaufman@aclu.org
2125492603
Party name: The American Civil Liberties Union and Cato Institute
Wesley M. Oliver
    Counsel of Record
Duquesne University School of Law
600 Forbes Avenue
Pittsburgh, PA 15282

oliverw@duq.edu
617-909-9849
Party name: Historians of Criminal Procedure
Elizabeth B. PrelogarSolicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Charles Harker Rhodes IV
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

harker.rhodes@kirkland.com
(202) 389-5000
Party name: Local Government Organizations (IMLA)
Dan Stormer
    Counsel of Record
Hadsell Stormer Renick & Dai LLP
128 N. Fair Oaks Avenue
Pasadena, CA 91103

dstormer@hadsellstormer.com
(626) 585-9600
Party name: False Confession and Wrongful Conviction Scholars
Charles David Weisselberg
    Counsel of Record
University of California
School of Law
Berkeley, CA 94720-7200

cdw@berkeley.edu
510-643-8159
Party name: California Attorneys for Criminal Justice and Professor Charles D. Weisselberg

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543