Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-486
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-486
Title:Oklahoma, Petitioner
v.
Dakota James Alleyn Shriver
Docketed:October 1, 2021
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Oklahoma
   Case Numbers:(F-2017-1279)
   Decision Date:April 29, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 24 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 1, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 28 2021Brief amicus curiae of Cherokee Nation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 29 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 1, 2021 to December 1, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 01 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 1, 2021.
Nov 24 2021Brief of respondent Dakota James Alleyn Shriver in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 24 2021Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Dakota James Alleyn Shriver.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 08 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/7/2022.
Dec 08 2021Reply of petitioner Oklahoma filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 10 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/14/2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Mithun Mansinghani
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Oklahoma Attorney General
313 NE 21st Street
Oklahoma City, OK 73105

mithun.mansinghani@oag.ok.gov
405-522-4392
Party name: State of Oklahoma
Attorneys for Respondent
Zachary Charles Schauf
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block, LLP
1099 New York Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ZSchauf@jenner.com
202-639-6000
Party name: Dakota James Alleyn Shriver
Other
Chrissi Ross Nimmo
    Counsel of Record
Cherokee Nation
P.O. Box 948
Tahlequah, OK 74465

chrissi-nimmo@cherokee.org
9184586998
Party name: Cherokee Nation

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543