Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-484
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-484
Title:Oklahoma, Petitioner
v.
Sonny Raye McCombs
Docketed:October 1, 2021
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Oklahoma
   Case Numbers:(F-2017-1000)
   Decision Date:April 29, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 24 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 1, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 26 2021Brief of respondent Sonny Raye McCombs in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 26 2021Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Sonny Raye McCombs.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 28 2021Brief amicus curiae of Cherokee Nation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 29 2021Brief amicus curiae of Muscogee (Creek) Nation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 04 2021Reply of petitioner Oklahoma filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 08 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/7/2022.
Jan 10 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/14/2022.
Jan 18 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/21/2022.
Jan 24 2022Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent GRANTED.
Jan 24 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Mithun Mansinghani
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Oklahoma Attorney General
313 NE 21st Street
Oklahoma City, OK 73105

mithun.mansinghani@oag.ok.gov
405-522-4392
Party name: State of Oklahoma
Attorneys for Respondent
Adam Shaddox Barnett
    Counsel of Record
Tulsa County Public Defender
500 W. Archer St.
Tulsa, OK 74105

adam.barnett@oscn.net
9185965948
Party name: Sonny Raye McCombs
Other
Riyaz Amir Kanji
    Counsel of Record
Kanji & Kantzen, PLLC
303 Detroit Street
Suite 400
Ann Arbor, MI 48104

rkanji@kanjikatzen.com
734-769-5400
Party name: Muscogee (Creek) Nation
Chrissi Ross Nimmo
    Counsel of Record
Cherokee Nation
P.O. Box 948
Tahlequah, OK 74465

chrissi-nimmo@cherokee.org
9184586998
Party name: Cherokee Nation

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543