Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-480
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-480
Title:William D. Brice, Petitioner
v.
California Faculty Association
Docketed:September 30, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-56164)
   Decision Date:April 28, 2021
Rule 12.4
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 23 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 1, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 01 2021Brief of respondents California Faculty Association, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 15 2021Reply of petitioners William Brice, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 16 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/3/2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Milton L. Chappell
    Counsel of Record
c/o National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation, Inc.
8001 Braddock Rd
Suite 600
Springfield, VA 22160

mlc@nrtw.org
703-770-3329
Party name: William Brice, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Scott A. Kronland
    Counsel of Record
Altshuler Berzon, LLP
177 Post Street
Suite 300
San Francisco, CA 94108

skronland@altshulerberzon.com
415-421-7151
Party name: California Faculty Association, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543