Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-474
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-474
Title:In Re Wisconsin Legislature, Petitioner
Docketed:September 28, 2021
Lower Ct:
   Case Numbers:
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 24 2021Petition for a writ of mandamus and/or prohibition filed. (Response due October 28, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 25 2021Brief of respondents Black Leaders Organizing for Communities, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 28 2021Brief of respondents Billie Johnson, Eric O'Keefe, Ed Perkins, and Ronald Zahn in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 28 2021Brief of respondents Lisa Hunter, Jacob Zabel, Jennifer Oh, John Persa, Geraldine Schertz, and Kathleen Qualheim in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 16 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/3/2021.
Dec 06 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Adam Karl Mortara
    Counsel of Record
Lawfair LLC
125 S. Wacker Driive Suite 300
Chicago, IL 60606

mortara@lawfairllc.com
773 750 7154
Party name: In re Wisconsin Legislature
Attorneys for Respondent
Marc Erik Elias
    Counsel of Record
Elias Law Group LLP
10 G Street N.E.
Suite 600
Washington, DC 20002

melias@elias.law
(202) 968-4490
Party name: Lisa Hunter, Jacob Zabel, Jennifer Oh, John Persa, Geraldine Schertz, and Kathleen Qualheim
Richard Michael Esenberg
    Counsel of Record
Wisconsin Institute for Law & Liberty
330 E. Kilbourn Avenue
Suite 725
Milwaukee, WI 53202

rick@will-law.org
414-727-9455
Party name: Billie Johnson, Eric O'Keefe, Ed Perkins, and Ronald Zahn
Paul March Smith
    Counsel of Record
Campaign Legal Center
1101 14th Street, NW, Suite 400
Washington, DC 20005

psmith@campaignlegalcenter.org
202-736-2200
Party name: Black Leaders Organizing for Communities, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543