Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-468
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-468
Title:National Pork Producers Council, et al., Petitioners
v.
Karen Ross, in Her Official Capacity as Secretary of the California Department of Food & Agriculture, et al.
Docketed:September 29, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-55631)
   Decision Date:July 28, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 27 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 29, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 11 2021Waiver of right of respondents Karen Ross, in her official capacity as Secretary of the California Department of Food and Agriculture, et al. to respond filed.
Oct 11 2021Waiver of right of respondents Humane Society of the United States, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 12 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, National Pork Producers Council, et al.
Blanket Consent
Oct 13 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/29/2021.
Oct 13 2021Waiver of National Pork Producers Council, et al. of right to respond not accepted for filing. (October 19, 2021)
Oct 19 2021Response Requested. (Due November 18, 2021)
Oct 29 2021Brief amicus curiae of Canadian Pork Council filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 01 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 18, 2021 to December 20, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 01 2021Response to motion for an extension of time from petitioner National Pork Producers Council, et al. filed.
Main Document
Nov 02 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part and the time is extended to and including December 8, 2021, for all respondents.
Nov 10 2021Brief amici curiae of Indiana, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 12 2021Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 18 2021Brief amici curiae of North Carolina Chamber Legal Institute, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 18 2021Brief amici curiae of National Association of Manufacturers, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 18 2021Brief amici curiae of Iowa Pork Producers Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 08 2021Brief of respondents Karen Ross, in her official capacity as Secretary of the California Department of Food and Agriculture, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 08 2021Brief of respondents Humane Society of the United States, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 21 2021Reply of petitioner National Pork Producers Council, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
Dec 22 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/7/2022.
Jan 10 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/14/2022.
Jan 18 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/21/2022.
Feb 11 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/18/2022.
Feb 22 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/25/2022.
Feb 28 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/4/2022.
Mar 14 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/18/2022.
Mar 21 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/25/2022.
Mar 28 2022Petition GRANTED.
Apr 06 2022Joint motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Apr 22 2022Joint motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including June 10, 2022. The time to file respondents' briefs on the merits is extended to and including August 8, 2022.
Apr 25 2022Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioners National Pork Producers Council, et al.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 16 2022Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner GRANTED.
Jun 10 2022Brief of petitioners National Pork Producers Council, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 14 2022ARGUMENT SET FOR Tuesday, October, 11, 2022.
Jun 14 2022Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 17 2022Brief amici curiae of National Association of Manufacturers, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 17 2022Brief amicus curiae of Protect the Harvest filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 17 2022Brief amicus curiae of The Buckeye Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 17 2022Brief amici curiae of North Carolina Chamber Legal Institute, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 17 2022Brief amici curiae of The Retail Litigation Center, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 17 2022Brief amicus curiae of Professor Lea Brilmayer in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 17 2022Brief amici curiae of Canadian Pork Council, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 17 2022Brief amicus curiae of American Association of Swine Veterinarians filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 17 2022Brief amici curiae of Indiana, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 17 2022Brief amici curiae of Agricultural And Resource Economics Professors in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 17 2022Brief amicus curiae of Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 17 2022Brief amici curiae of Professors Michael Knoll, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 17 2022Brief amicus curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 17 2022Brief amici curiae of Iowa Pork Producers Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 17 2022Brief amicus curiae of North American Meat Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 17 2022Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 17 2022Brief amicus curiae of Association for Accessible Medicines filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 17 2022Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 17 2022Brief amicus curiae of National Taxpayers Union Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 17 2022Brief amici curiae of Association Des Éleveurs De Canards Et D’oies Du Québec, et al. filed.
Proof of ServiceCertificate of Word CountMain Document
Jun 22 2022Record requested from the 9th Circuit.
Jun 23 2022The record from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit is electronic and located on Pacer.
Jul 21 2022CIRCULATED
Aug 04 2022Brief amicus curiae of Dr. Leon Barringer filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 08 2022Brief of State Respondents filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 10 2022Motion for leave to file respondents' brief on the merits out of time filed by respondents The Humane Society of the United States, et al.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 10 2022Brief of respondents The Humane Society of the United States, et al. filed (September 9, 2022). (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 12 2022Brief amici curiae of State of Illinois, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 12 2022Brief amici curiae of The Center for a Humane Economy, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 15 2022Motion for divided argument filed by respondents The Humane Society of the United States, et al.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 15 2022Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae, for divided argument, and for enlargement of time for oral argument filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Aug 15 2022Brief amici curiae of Animal Protection Organizations and Law Professors filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 15 2022Brief amici curiae of Worker Safety Advocates filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 15 2022Brief amici curiae of Donald Broom, Elena Contreras, Gwendolen Reyes-Illg, James Reynolds, and 374 Additional Animal-Welfare Scientists and Veterinarians filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 15 2022Brief amicus curiae of Animal Protection and Rescue League, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 15 2022Brief amicus curiae of The American Society For The Prevention of Cruelty to Animals filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 15 2022Brief amici curiae of Professors Barry Friedman and Daniel T. Deacon filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 15 2022Brief amicus curiae of Trade Law Professor Mark Wu filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 15 2022Brief amici curiae of National League for Cities, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 15 2022Brief amicus curiae of United States Senator Cory Booker filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 15 2022Brief amici curiae of Jim Keen DVM PH.D, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 15 2022Brief amici curiae of O. Carter Snead, Mary Eberstadt, and Matthew Scully filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 15 2022Brief amici curiae of Economic Research Organizations filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 15 2022Brief amici curiae of American Public Health Association, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 15 2022Brief amicus curiae of Public Citizen filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 15 2022Brief amici curiae of Federalism Scholars filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 15 2022Brief amicus curiae of Perdue Premium Meat Company Inc. d/b/a Niman Ranch filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 15 2022Brief amici curiae of Global Animal Partnership and EarthClaims LLC filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 15 2022Brief amicus curiae of Physicians Committee For Responsible Medicine filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 15 2022Brief amicus curiae of Northeast Organic Dairy Producers Alliance filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 15 2022Brief amici curiae of Small and Independent Farming Businesses, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 15 2022Brief amici curiae of Historians Thomas Aiello and Joshua Specht filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 15 2022Brief amicus curiae of Association of California Egg Farmers filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 15 2022Brief amicus curiae of ButcherBox filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 15 2022Brief amici curiae of Constitutional Law Scholars filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 07 2022Reply of petitioners National Pork Producers Council, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 09 2022Motion for leave to file respondents' brief on the merits out of time GRANTED.
Sep 09 2022Motion for divided argument filed by respondents GRANTED.
Sep 09 2022Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae, for divided argument, and for enlargement of time for oral argument GRANTED, and the time is divided as follows: 20 minutes for petitioners, 15 minutes for the Solicitor General, 25 minutes for the state respondents, and 10 minutes for The Humane Society of the United States, et al. respondents.
Oct 11 2022Argued. For petitioners: Timothy S. Bishop, Chicago, Ill.; and Edwin S. Kneedler, Deputy Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.) For state respondents: Michael J. Mongan, Solicitor General, San Francisco, Cal. For Humane Society of the United States, et al. respondents: Jeffrey A. Lamken, Washington, D. C.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Timothy S. Bishop
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown, LLP
71 South Wacker Drive
Chicago, IL 60606

tbishop@mayerbrown.com
3127017829
Party name: National Pork Producers Council, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Samuel Thomas Harbourt
    Counsel of Record
California Department of Justice, Office of the Solicitor General
455 Golden Gate Ave Suite 11000
San Francisco, CA 94102

Samuel.Harbourt@doj.ca.gov
415-510-3919
Party name: Karen Ross, in her official capacity as Secretary of the California Department of Food and Agriculture; Tomas Aragon, Director of the Department of Public Health; Rob Bonta, Attorney General
Bruce Andrew Wagman
    Counsel of Record
Riley Safer Holmes & Cancila LLP
456 Montgomery Street
16th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94104

bwagman@rshc-law.com
415-275-8550
Party name: The Humane Society of the United States, Animal Legal Defense Fund, Animal Equality, The Humane League, Farm Sanctuary, Compassion In World Farming USA, Animal Outlook
Jeffrey Alan LamkenMoloLamken LLP
The Watergate, Suite 500
600 New Hampshire Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20037

jlamken@mololamken.com
(202) 556-2010
Party name: The Humane Society of the United States, Animal Legal Defense Fund, Animal Equality, The Humane League, Farm Sanctuary, Compassion In World Farming USA, Animal Outlook
Michael James MonganState of CA, Department of Justice
455 Golden Gate Ave., Suite 11000
San Francisco, CA 94102

michael.mongan@doj.ca.gov
(415) 510-3920
Party name: Karen Ross, in her official capacity as Secretary of the California Department of Food and Agriculture; Tomas Aragon, Director of the Department of Public Health; Rob Bonta, Attorney General
Richard Matthew WiseCalifornia Department of Justice, Office of the Attorney General
1300 I Street, Suite 125
Sacramento, CA 94244

Matthew.Wise@doj.ca.gov
(916) 210-6046
Party name: Karen Ross, in her official capacity as Secretary of the California Department of Food and Agriculture; Tomas Aragon, Director of the Department of Public Health; Rob Bonta, Attorney General
Other
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Benjamin Daniel Battles
    Counsel of Record
Pollock Cohen LLP
50 Lakeside Avenue
Burlington, VT 05401

ben@pollockcohen.com
802-793-5512
Party name: Economic Research Organizations
Stephan E. Becker
    Counsel of Record
Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP
1200 Seventeenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20036

stephan.becker@pillsburylaw.com
(202) 663-8000
Party name: Canadian Pork Council
Jessica Lynn Blome
    Counsel of Record
Greenfire Law, PC
P.O. Box 8055
Berkeley, CA 94710

jblome@greenfirelaw.com
(510) 900-9502
Party name: The Center for a Humane Economy, et al.
Eric Bradley Boettcher
    Counsel of Record
Wright Close & Barger, LLP
One Riverway
Suite 2200
Houston, TX 77056

boettcher@wrightclosebarger.com
(713) 572-4321
Party name: Constitutional Law Scholars
Beth Susan Brinkmann
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling
850 Tenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001-4956

bbrinkmann@cov.com
202-662-5312
Party name: The Retail Litigation Center, Inc., The Restaurant Law Center, The Food Industry Association, The National Retail Federation, and Affordable Food For All
Jennifer Helen Chin
    Counsel of Record
ASPCA
520 Eighth Avenue, 7th floor
New York, NY 10018

jennifer.chin@aspca.org
(217) 552-8303
Party name: The American Society For The Prevention of Cruelty to Animals
James Wesley Crooks
    Counsel of Record
Fairmark Partners, LLP
1825 7th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001

jamie@fairmarklaw.com
(619) 507-4182
Party name: Small and Independent Farming Businesses, et al.
Glenn Ari Danas
    Counsel of Record
Clarkson Law Firm, P.C.
22525 Pacific Coast Highway
Malibu, CA 90265

gdanas@clarksonlawfirm.com
213-788-4050
Party name: Senator Cory Booker
Sheldon Eisenberg
    Counsel of Record
Sullivan & Triggs, LLP
1230 Montana Avenue
Suite 201
Santa Monica, CA 90403

seisenberg@sullivantriggs.com
3104518300
Party name: Thomas Aiello and Joshua Specht
Roy T. Englert Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Kramer Levin Robbins Russell
2000 K Street NW
4th Floor
Washington, DC 20006

renglert@kramerlevin.com
2027754503
Party name: Canadian Pork Council, OPORMEX, and Illinois Pork Producers Association
Thomas M. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Indiana AG's Office, IGC S., 5th Fl.
302 W. Washington
Indianapolis, IN 46204

tom.fisher@atg.in.gov
317-232-6255
Party name: Indiana, et al.
Gabriel Kalman Gillett
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
353 N. Clark Street
Chicago, IL 60654

GGillett@jenner.com
312-222-9350
Party name: Professor Lea Brilmayer
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Professors Barry Friedman and Daniel T. Deacon
Kathleen Roberta Hartnett
    Counsel of Record
Cooley LLP
3 Embarcadero Center
20th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94111

khartnett@cooley.com
(415) 693-2000
Party name: Agricultural And Resource Economics Professors
Joseph Darcy Henchman
    Counsel of Record
National Taxpayers Union Foundation
122 C Street N.W.
#650
Washington, DC 20001

jbh@ntu.org
(703) 683-5700
Party name: National Taxpayers Union Foundation
Erik S. Jaffe
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr | Jaffe LLP
1717 K Street, N.W., Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

ejaffe@schaerr-jaffe.com
202-787-1060
Party name: North Carolina Chamber Legal Institute, North Carolina Pork Council, North Carolina Farm Bureau, and 11 Other State Farm Bureaus, Pork Councils, and Business Groups
Steffen Nathanael Johnson
    Counsel of Record
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati
1700 K Street, NW, Fifth Floor
Washington, DC 20006

sjohnson@wsgr.com
(202) 973-8888
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Tassity Shardae JohnsonJenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Avenue NW
Washington, CA 20001

tjohnson@jenner.com
2026376303
Party name: Professor Lea Brilmayer
Nandan Maheshchandra Joshi
    Counsel of Record
Public Citizen Litigation Group
1600 20th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20009

njoshi@citizen.org
(202) 588-1000
Party name: Public Citizen
Ira T. Kasdan
    Counsel of Record
Kelley Drye & Warren LLP
3050 K Street, NW
Suite 400
Washington, DC 20007

ikasdan@kelleydrye.com
202-342-8864
Party name: Protect the Harvest
Allon Kedem
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
601 Massachusetts Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20001

allon.kedem@arnoldporter.com
2029425000
Party name: Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America
John J. Korzen
    Counsel of Record
PO Box 7206
Winston-Salem, NC 27109

korzenjj@wfu.edu
3367585832
Party name: National League for Cities; U.S. Conference of Mayors, International City/County Management Association, and International Municipal Lawyers Association
Deborah Joyce La Fetra
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
555 Capitol Mall, Suite 1290
Sacramento, CA 95814

DLaFetra@pacificlegal.org
(916) 419-7111
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation
Jay Philip Lefkowitz
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
601 Lexington Avenue
New York, NY 10022

lefkowitz@kirkland.com
(212) 446-4800
Party name: Association for Accessible Medicines
Mark Matthew Leitner
    Counsel of Record
Laffey, Leitner & Goode LLC
325 E. Chicago St., Suite 200
Milwaukee, WI 53202

mleitner@llgmke.com
4143127108
Party name: Jim Keen DVM PH.D
Gregory M. Lipper
    Counsel of Record
LeGrand Law PLLC
1100 H Street NW
Suite 1220
Washington, DC 20005

glipper@legrandpllc.com
(202) 996-0919
Party name: Federalism Scholars
Sean Marotta
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

sean.marotta@hoganlovells.com
2026375600
Party name: National Association of Manufacturers, et al.
John Mercer Masslon II
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20036

jmasslon@wlf.org
(202) 588-0302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation
Eldon L. McAfee
    Counsel of Record
Brick Gentry PC
6701 Westown Parkway
Suite 100
West Des Moines, IA 50266

eldon.mcafee@brickgentrylaw.com
5152741450
Party name: Iowa Pork Producers Association, et al.
Katherine Anne Meyer
    Counsel of Record
Harvard Law School Animal Law & Policy Clinic
1607 Massachusetts Ave.
Cambridge, MA 02138

kmeyer@law.harvard.edu
617-496-5145
Party name: Animal Protection Organizations and Law Professors
Mitchell Y. Mirviss
    Counsel of Record
Venable LLP
600 Massachusetts Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20001

mymirviss@venable.com
202-344-4400
Party name: Perdue Premium Meat Company Inc. d/b/a Niman Ranch
Elizabeth Rose Moulton
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe, LLP
405 Howard Street
San Francisco, CA 94105

emoulton@orrick.com
415-773-5673
Party name: Dr. Leon Barringer
David Samuel Muraskin
    Counsel of Record
Public Justice
1620 L Street NW, Suite 630
Washington, DC 20036

dmuraskin@publicjustice.net
202-861-5245
Party name: Worker Safety Advocates
Jason Edward Neal
    Counsel of Record
HWG LLP
1919 M Street NW
8th Floor
Washington, DC 20036

jneal@hwglaw.com
202-794-0996
Party name: Northeast Organic Dairy Producers Alliance
Jane Elinor Notz
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General, State of Illinois
100 West Randolph Street, 12th Floor
Chicago, IL 60601

Jane.Notz@ilag.gov
312-814-5376
Party name: State of Illinois, et al.
Larry James Obhof Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Shumaker, Loop and Kendrick LLP
2400 Huntington Center
41 South High Street
Columbus, OH 43215

lobhof@shumaker.com
(614) 463-9441
Party name: The Buckeye Institute
Corey Page
    Counsel of Record
Evans & Page
2912 Diamond St. #346
San Francisco, CA 94131

cpage@evansandpage.com
(415) 896-5072
Party name: Physicians Committee For Responsible Medicine
Bryan William Pease
    Counsel of Record
Pease Law, APC
3960 W. Point Loma Blvd.
Suite H-2562
San Diego, CA 92110

bryan@peaselaw.org
619-723-0369
Party name: Animal Protection and Rescue League, Inc.
Gregory Gerber Rapawy
    Counsel of Record
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.
1615 M Street, N.W.
Suite 400
Washington, DC 20036

grapawy@kellogghansen.com
202-326-7967
Party name: Donald Broom, Elena Contreras, Gwendolen Reyes-Illg, James Reynolds, and 374 Additional Animal-Welfare Scientists and Veterinarians
Thomas Glenn Saunders
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20006

thomas.saunders@wilmerhale.com
202-663-6536
Party name: Association of California Egg Farmers
Joshua Irwin Schiller
    Counsel of Record
Boies, Schiller & Flexner LLP
55 Hudson Yards
New York, NY 10001

jischiller@bsfllp.com
(212) 446-2300
Party name: ButcherBox
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
2028420200
Party name: The Cato Institute
Alethea Anne Swift
    Counsel of Record
Massey & Gail LLP
1000 Maine Ave., SW, Suite 450
Washington, DC 20024

aswift@masseygail.com
202-964-7678
Party name: Global Animal Partnership and EarthClaims LLC
Michael Tenenbaum
    Counsel of Record
The Office of Michael Tenenbaum, Esq.
1431 Ocean Avenue, Ste. 400
Santa Monica, CA 90401-2136

mt@post.harvard.edu
(424) 246-8685
Party name: Association Des Éleveurs De Canards Et D’oies Du Québec, Hvfg LLC, And Sean “Hot” Chaney
Aaron D. Van Oort
    Counsel of Record
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
2200 Wells Fargo Center
90 South 7th Street
Minneapolis, MN 55402

aaron.vanoort@faegredrinker.com
612-766-8138
Party name: American Association of Swine Veterinarians
Henry Sabath Weisburg
    Counsel of Record
Shearman and Sterling LLP
599 Lexington Avenue
New York, NY 10022

HWeisburg@Shearman.com
212-848-4000
Party name: American Public Health Association, Infectious Diseases Society of America, Center for Food Safety, et al.
Megan Marie Wold
    Counsel of Record
Cooper & Kirk, PLLC
1523 New Hampshire Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036

mwold@cooperkirk.com
2022209600
Party name: O. Carter Snead, Mary Eberstadt, and Matthew Scully
Eric B. Wolff
    Counsel of Record
Perkins Coie LLP
1201 Third Avenue
Suite 4900
Seattle, WA 98101-3029

ewolff@perkinscoie.com
206-359-3779
Party name: Professors Michael Knoll and Ruth Mason
Mark Wu
    Counsel of Record
Harvard Law School
1563 Massachusetts Avenue
Cambridge, MA 02138

mwu@law.harvard.edu
617-496-5493
Party name: Trade Law Professor Mark Wu
Paul J. Zidlicky
    Counsel of Record
Sidley & Austin
1501 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

pzidlicky@sidley.com
202-736-8000
Party name: North American Meat Institute

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543