Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-467
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-467
Title:Clifton Merrill Parish, Petitioner
v.
Oklahoma, et al.
Docketed:September 29, 2021
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Oklahoma
   Case Numbers:(PR-2021-366)
   Decision Date:August 12, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 27 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 29, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 26 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 29, 2021 to November 22, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 26 2021Brief amicus curiae of Oklahoma Criminal Defense Lawyer's Association filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 27 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 22, 2021.
Nov 22 2021Brief of respondent Oklahoma in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 08 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/7/2022.
Dec 08 2021Reply of petitioner Clifton Merrill Parish filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 10 2022Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michael R. Dreeben
    Counsel of Record
O’Melveny & Myers LLP
1625 I St. NW
Washington, DC 20006

mdreeben@omm.com
202-383-5400
Party name: Clifton Merrill Parish
Attorneys for Respondents
Mithun Mansinghani
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Oklahoma Attorney General
313 NE 21st Street
Oklahoma City, OK 73105

mithun.mansinghani@oag.ok.gov
405-522-4392
Party name: Oklahoma, et al.
Other
Andrea Digilio Miller
    Counsel of Record
Oklahoma Criminal Defense Lawyers Association
800 N Harvey Ave.
Oklahoma City, OK 73102

admiller@okcu.edu
405-208-6161
Party name: Oklahoma Criminal Defense Lawyer's Association

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543