Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-463
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-463
Vide 21-582, 21-583, 21-587
Title:Whole Woman's Health, et al., Petitioners
v.
Austin Reeve Jackson, Judge, District Court of Texas, 114th District, et al.
Docketed:September 28, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(21-50792)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 23 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari before judgment filed. (Response due October 28, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 23 2021Motion to expedite consideration of the petition for a writ of certiorari before judgment filed by petitioners.
Main Document
Oct 18 2021Petitioners’ motion to expedite consideration of the petition for a writ of certiorari before judgment is granted, and respondents are directed to file a response to the petition on or before noon on Thursday, October 21, 2021.
Oct 21 2021Brief of respondents in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 21 2021Brief amicus curiae of Firearms Policy Coalition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 22 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari before judgment GRANTED. The briefs of the parties, limited to 13,000 words, are to be filed electronically on or before 5 p.m., Wednesday, October 27, 2021. Reply briefs, if any, limited to 6,000 words, are to be filed electronically on or before 5 p.m., Friday, October 29, 2021. Any amicus curiae briefs are to be filed electronically on or before 5 p.m., Wednesday, October 27, 2021. Booklet format briefs prepared in compliance with Rule 33.1 shall be submitted as soon as possible thereafter. The parties are not required to file a joint appendix. The case is set for oral argument on Monday, November 1, 2021.
Oct 22 2021ARGUMENT SET FOR Monday, November 1, 2021.
Oct 23 2021Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Austin Reeve Jackson, et al.
Blanket Consent
Oct 24 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Whole Woman's Health, et al.
Blanket Consent
Oct 25 2021Motion for divided argument filed by respondents.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 25 2021Brief amicus curiae of California ProLife Council filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 26 2021Brief amicus curiae of The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty filed (also in 21-588). VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 26 2021Brief amici curiae of Leading Medical Organizations filed (also in 21-588). VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 26 2021Motion for divided argument filed by respondents DENIED.
Oct 26 2021In lieu of filing separate briefs in both No. 21-463 and No. 21-588 (21A85), the state respondents may file a single opening brief, limited to 20,000 words, and a single reply brief, limited to 9,000 words. (Also in 21-588 [21A85]).
Oct 26 2021Brief amici curiae of Professors Adam Lamparello, Charles E. MacLean, and Brian Owsley filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 27 2021Brief of petitioners Whole Woman's Health, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 27 2021Consolidated brief of state respondents filed (also in 21-588). VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 27 2021Brief of respondent Penny Clarkston filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 27 2021Brief of respondent Mark Lee Dickson filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 27 2021Brief amici curiae of Massachusetts, et al. filed (also in 21-588). VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 27 2021Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 27 2021Brief amici curiae of Legal Scholars filed (also in 21-588). VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 27 2021Brief amici curiae of Local Governments filed (also in 21-588). VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 27 2021Amicus brief of Texas Medical Association not accepted for filing. (October 27, 2021--brief needs correction; resubmitted).
Oct 27 2021Amicus brief of Texas Medical Association not accepted for filing. (October 27, 2021--resubmitted brief needs correction)
Oct 27 2021Brief amici curiae of Constitutional Law, Federal Courts, Civil Rights, and Civil Procedure Scholars filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 27 2021Brief amicus curiae of Firearms Policy Coalition filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Oct 27 2021Brief amici curiae of Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 27 2021Brief amicus curiae of NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 27 2021Brief amicus curiae of American Center for Law and Justice filed (also in 21-588). VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 27 2021Brief amicus curiae of Life Legal Defense Foundation filed (also in 21-588). VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 27 2021Brief amici curiae of 128 Current and Former Prosecutors and Law Enforcement Leaders, et al. filed (also in 21-588). VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 27 2021Record on appeal available on PACER. The USDC, W. District of Texas - transcript of August 4, 2021 hearing electronically received.
Oct 29 2021Reply brief of petitioners Whole Woman's Health, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 29 2021Consolidated reply brief of state respondents filed (also in 21-588). VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 29 2021Reply brief of respondent Mark Lee Dickson filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Oct 29 2021Reply brief of respondent Penny Clarkston filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 01 2021Argued. For petitioners: Marc A. Hearron, Washington, D. C. For respondents: Judd E. Stone, II, Solicitor General, Austin, Tex.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Marc Andrew Hearron
    Counsel of Record
Center for Reproductive Rights
1634 Eye St NW
Suite 600
Washington, DC 20006

mhearron@reprorights.org
202-524-5539
Party name: Whole Woman's Health, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Heather Gebelin Hacker
    Counsel of Record
Hacker Stephens LLP
108 Wild Basin Rd
Suite 250
Austin, TX 78746

heather@hackerstephens.com
512-399-3022
Party name: Penny Clarkston
Jonathan F. Mitchell
    Counsel of Record
Mitchell Law PLLC
111 Congress Avenue
Suite 400
Austin, TX 78701

jonathan@mitchell.law
(512) 686-3940
Party name: Mark Lee Dickson
Judd Edward Stone II
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

judd.stone@oag.texas.gov
512-936-1700
Party name: Austin Reeve Jackson, et al.
Other
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202-296-6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center
Sheila Ann Green
    Counsel of Record
Shelia Green, Esq
P.O. Box 1434
Columbia, CA 95310-1434

sheilaanngreen@gmail.com
2093807108
Party name: California ProLife Council
Amanda Stephanie Hainsworth
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Massachusetts Attorney General
1 Ashburton Place
Boston, MA 02108

amanda.hainsworth@mass.gov
617-963-2618
Party name: Massachusetts, et al.
Claudia Lesley Hammerman
    Counsel of Record
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
1285 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10019-6064

chammerman@paulweiss.com
212-373-3000
Party name: Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, et al.
Kathleen Roberta Hartnett
    Counsel of Record
Cooley LLP
3 Embarcadero Center
20th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94111

khartnett@cooley.com
(415) 693-2071
Party name: Constitutional Law, Federal Courts, Civil Rights, and Civil Procedure Scholars
Erik S. Jaffe
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr | Jaffe LLP
1717 K Street, N.W., Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

ejaffe@schaerr-jaffe.com
202-787-1060
Party name: Firearms Policy Coalition
Adam Lamparello
    Counsel of Record
Georgia College and State University
231 W. Hancock Street
Milledgeville, GA 31061

adamlamparello@yahoo.com
(478) 445-5004
Party name: Professors Adam Lamparello, Charles E. MacLean, and Brian Owsley
John P. Mastando III
    Counsel of Record
Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP
767 Fifth Avenue
New York, NY 10153

john.mastando@weil.com
(212) 310-8000
Party name: 128 Current and Former Prosecutors and Law Enforcement Leaders, et al.
Alison Beth Miller
    Counsel of Record
Holwell Shuster and Goldberg
425 Lexington Avenue, 14th Floor
New York, NY 10017

amiller@hsgllp.com
(646) 837-8559
Party name: Legal Scholars
Jonathan B. Miller
    Counsel of Record
Public Rights Project
4096 Piedmont Avenue, #149
Oakland, CA 94611

jon@publicrightsproject.org
6468316113
Party name: Local Governments
Mark Leonard Rienzi
    Counsel of Record
The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty
1919 Pennsylvania Avenue NW
Suite 400
Washington, DC 20006

mrienzi@becketlaw.org
(202) 955-0095
Party name: The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty
Jay Alan Sekulow
    Counsel of Record
American Center for Law and Justice
201 Maryland Avenue, N.E.
Washington, DC 20002

sekulow@aclj.org
2025468890
Party name: American Center for Law and Justice
Shannon Rose Selden
    Counsel of Record
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
919 3rd Avenue
New York, NY 10022

srselden@debevoise.com
212-909-6000
Party name: Leading Medical Organizations
Catherine Wynne Short
    Counsel of Record
Life Legal Defense Foundation
P.O. Box 2105
Napa, CA 94558

kshort@lldf.org
(707) 224-6675
Party name: Life Legal Defense Foundation
Samuel Spital
    Counsel of Record
NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc.
40 Rector Street
Fifth Floor
New York, NY 10006

sspital@naacpldf.org
212-965-2205
Party name: NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc.
Donald P. Wilcox
    Counsel of Record
Texas Medical Assoc.
401 West 15th Street
10th Floor
Austin, TX 78701

rocky.wilcox@texmed.org
5123701336
Party name: Texas Medical Association

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543