Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-462
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-462
Title:Jolie Johnson, et al., Petitioners
v.
Bethany Hospice and Palliative Care LLC
Docketed:September 27, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-11624)
   Decision Date:April 26, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 23 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 27, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 29 2021Waiver of right of respondent Bethany Hospice and Palliative Care LLC to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 06 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/29/2021.
Oct 12 2021Response Requested. (Due November 12, 2021)
Nov 05 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 12, 2021 to December 13, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 08 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 13, 2021.
Dec 13 2021Brief of respondent Bethany Hospice and Palliative Care LLC in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word CountOther
Dec 28 2021Reply of petitioners Jolie Johnson, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 29 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/14/2022.
Jan 18 2022The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.
May 24 2022Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 07 2022Supplemental brief of petitioners Jolie Johnson, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Tejinder Singh
    Counsel of Record
Sparacino PLLC
1920 L Street, NW
Suite 835
Washington, DC 20036

tejinder@sparacinopllc.com
2026293530
Party name: Jolie Johnson, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Michael Thomas Raupp
    Counsel of Record
Husch Blackwell LLP
4801 Main Street, Suite 1000
Kansas City, MO 64112

michael.raupp@huschblackwell.com
816-983-8000
Party name: Bethany Hospice and Palliative Care LLC
Other
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543