SEARCH TIPS
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 21-457
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 21-457
Title:
ENCO Systems, Inc., Petitioner
v.
DaVincia, LLC
Docketed:
September 27, 2021
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
Case Numbers:
(2020-1995)
Decision Date:
March 8, 2021
Rehearing Denied:
April 23, 2021
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Sep 20 2021
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 27, 2021)
Petition
Appendix
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Oct 04 2021
Waiver of right of respondent DaVincia, LLC to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 06 2021
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/29/2021.
Nov 01 2021
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Bradley LeGrand Smith
Counsel of Record
Endurance Law Group PLC
133 W. Michigan Ave., Ste. 10
Jackson, MI 49201
bsmith@endurancelaw.com
517-879-0253
Party name: ENCO Systems, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
Dennis John Abdelnour
Counsel of Record
Honigman LLP
155 North Wacker Drive, Suite 3100
Chicago, IL 60606
dabdelnour@honigman.com
312-701-9348
Party name: DaVincia, LLC
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##