Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-451
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-451
Title:Oklahoma, Petitioner
v.
Shawn Thomas Jones
Docketed:September 23, 2021
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Oklahoma
   Case Numbers:(F-2017-1309)
   Decision Date:April 22, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 18 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 25, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 22 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 25, 2021 to November 24, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 25 2021Brief amicus curiae of Chickasaw Nation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 26 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 24, 2021.
Nov 05 2021Brief of respondent Shawn T. Jones in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 05 2021Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Shawn T. Jones.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 18 2021Reply of petitioner Oklahoma filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 08 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/7/2022.
Jan 10 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/14/2022.
Jan 18 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/21/2022.
Jun 29 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/29/2022.
Jun 30 2022Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent GRANTED.
Jun 30 2022Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Oklahoma v. Castro-Huerta, 597 U. S. ___ (2022).
Aug 01 2022JUDGMENT ISSUED
Aug 01 2022MANDATE ISSUED

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Mithun Mansinghani
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Oklahoma Attorney General
313 NE 21st Street
Oklahoma City, OK 73105

mithun.mansinghani@oag.ok.gov
405-522-4392
Party name: Oklahoma
Attorneys for Respondent
Zachary Charles Schauf
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block, LLP
1099 New York Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ZSchauf@jenner.com
202-639-6000
Party name: Shawn T. Jones
Other
Frank Sharp Holleman IV
    Counsel of Record
Sonosky, Chambers, Sachse, Endreson & Perry, LLP
1425 K Street NW, Suite 600
Washington, DC 20005

fholleman@sonosky.com
2026820240
Party name: Chickasaw Nation

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543