Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-448
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-448
Title:France.com, Inc., Petitioner
v.
The French Republic, et al.
Docketed:September 23, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-1016)
   Decision Date:March 25, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:April 19, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 16 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 25, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 29 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 25, 2021 to November 24, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 30 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted in part and the time is extended to and including November 9, 2021.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Benjamin Stover Barlow
    Counsel of Record
Dunlap Bennett & Ludwig PLLC
211 Church Street SE
Leesburg, VA 20175

bbarlow@dbllawyers.com
(703) 777-7319
Party name: France.Com, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
John Michael Griem Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Carter Ledyard Milburn LLC
2 Wall Street
New York, NY 10005

griem@clm.com
2122388659
Party name: The French Republic, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543