Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-441
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-441
Title:Alfred H. Siegel, Trustee of the Circuit City Stores, Inc. Liquidating Trust, Petitioner
v.
John P. Fitzgerald, III, Acting United States Trustee for Region 4
Docketed:September 22, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-2240, 19-2255)
   Decision Date:April 29, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 20 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 22, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 12 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 22, 2021 to November 22, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 13 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 22, 2021.
Nov 04 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 22, 2021 to December 8, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 05 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including December 8, 2021.
Dec 08 2021Brief of respondent John P. Fitzgerald, III, Acting United States Trustee for Region 4 in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 09 2021Waiver of the 14-day waiting period under 15.5 filed.
Main Document
Dec 15 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/7/2022.
Jan 10 2022Petition GRANTED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Daniel L. Geyser
    Counsel of Record
Haynes and Boone, LLP
2323 Victory Avenue, Ste. 700
Dallas, TX 75219

daniel.geyser@haynesboone.com
303-382-6219
Party name: Alfred H. Siegel, Trustee of the Circuit City Stores, Inc. Liquidating Trust
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. PrelogarSolicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: John P. Fitzgerald, III, Acting United States Trustee for Region 4

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543