Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-439 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-439 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Michael Nance, Petitioner
v.
Timothy C. Ward, Commissioner, Georgia Department of Corrections, et al.
Docketed:September 22, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-11393)
   Decision Date:December 2, 2020
   Rehearing Denied:April 20, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 17 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 22, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 23 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 22, 2021 to November 22, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 24 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 22, 2021.
Oct 22 2021Motion of Legal Scholars and Academics for leave to file amicus brief not accepted for filing. (October 25, 2021)
Oct 22 2021Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Legal Scholars and Academics.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 22 2021Brief of respondents Comm'r, Georgia Department of Corrections, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 07 2021Reply of petitioner Michael Nance filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 08 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/7/2022.
Jan 10 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/14/2022.
Jan 14 2022Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Legal Scholars and Academics GRANTED.
Jan 14 2022Petition GRANTED.
Feb 16 2022Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner Michael Nance.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 22 2022Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner GRANTED.
Feb 25 2022Brief of petitioner Michael Nance filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2022Brief amici curiae of Legal Scholars filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 04 2022Brief amici curiae of American Civil Liberties Union, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2022Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 14 2022Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae, for divided argument, and for enlargement of time for oral argument filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 15 2022ARGUMENT SET FOR Monday, April 25, 2022.
Mar 16 2022Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 11th Circuit.
Mar 17 2022The record received from the U.S.D.C. Northern District of Georgia (Atlanta) has been electronically filed.
Mar 17 2022The record from the U.S.C.A. 11th Circuit is electronic and located on Pacer.
Mar 23 2022CIRCULATED
Mar 28 2022Brief of respondents Ward, Commissioner, Georgia Department of Corrections, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 31 2022Brief amici curiae of Jonathan F. Mitchell and Adam K. Mortara filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 04 2022Brief amici curiae of Texas, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 14 2022Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae, for divided argument, and for enlargement of time for oral argument GRANTED.
Apr 15 2022Reply of petitioner Michael Nance filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 25 2022Argued. For petitioner: Matthew S. Hellman, Washington, D. C.; and Masha G. Hansford, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. For respondents: Stephen J. Petrany, Solicitor General, Atlanta, Ga.
Jun 23 2022Judgment REVERSED and case REMANDED. Kagan, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Roberts, C. J., and Breyer, Sotomayor, and Kavanaugh, JJ., joined. Barrett, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Thomas, Alito, and Gorsuch, JJ., joined.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Matthew S. Hellman
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Ave., NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

mhellman@jenner.com
202-639-6000
Party name: Michael Nance
Attorneys for Respondents
Stephen John Petrany
    Counsel of Record
Georgia Department of Law
40 Capitol Square SW
Atlanta, GA 30334

spetrany@law.ga.gov
404-458-3408
Party name: Comm'r, Georgia Department of Corrections, et al.
Clint Christopher MalcolmGeorgia Department of Law
40 Capitol Square, S.W.
Atlanta, GA 30334

cmalcolm@law.ga.gov
404-458-3619
Party name: Comm'r, Georgia Department of Corrections, et al.
Other
David D. Cole
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
915 15th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

dcole@aclu.org
212-549-2611
Party name: American Civil Liberties Union, et al.
Adam Karl Mortara
    Counsel of Record
125 S. Wacker Driive Suite 300
Chicago, IL 60606

mortara@lawfairllc.com
773 750 7154
Party name: Jonathan F. Mitchell and Adam K. Mortara
Elizabeth B. PrelogarSolicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Bruce H. Schneider
    Counsel of Record
Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP
180 Maiden Lane
New York, NY 10038

bschneider@stroock.com
(212) 806-5400
Party name: Legal Scholars and Academics
Judd Edward Stone II
    Counsel of Record
Texas Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

judd.stone@oag.texas.gov
512-936-1700
Party name: States of Texas, Alabama, Arkansas, Arizona, Florida, Idaho, Indiana, Kentucky, Louisiana, Mississippi, Montana, Nebraska, Oklahoma, South Dakota and Utah

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543