Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-438
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-438
Title:Olaf Sööt Design, LLC, Petitioner
v.
Daktronics, Inc., et al.
Docketed:September 22, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2020-1009, 2020-1034)
   Decision Date:January 7, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:April 19, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 16 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 22, 2021)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 30 2021Waiver of right of respondent Daktronics, Inc., et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 06 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/29/2021.
Oct 12 2021Response Requested. (Due November 12, 2021)
Nov 12 2021Brief of respondents Daktronics, Inc., et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 29 2021Reply of petitioner Olaf Sööt Design, LLC filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 01 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/7/2022.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
James Moore Bollinger
    Counsel of Record
Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP
875 Third Avenue
New York, NY 10022

james.bollinger@troutman.com
2127046000
Party name: Olaf Sööt Design, LLC
Attorneys for Respondents
Kenneth L. Bressler
    Counsel of Record
Blank Rome LLP
1271 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10020

ken.bressler@blankrome.com
2128855511
Party name: Daktronics, Inc., et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543