Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-432
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-432
Title:Adolfo R. Arellano, Petitioner
v.
Denis R. McDonough, Secretary of Veterans Affairs
Docketed:September 21, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2020-1073)
   Decision Date:June 17, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 17 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 21, 2021)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 01 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 21, 2021 to November 22, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 04 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including November 22, 2021.
Oct 21 2021Brief amicus curiae of Military-Veterans Advocacy Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 09 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 22, 2021 to December 22, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 10 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including December 22, 2021.
Dec 22 2021Brief of respondent Denis R. McDonough, Secretary of Veterans Affairs in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Dec 30 2021Reply of petitioner Adolfo R. Arellano filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 05 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/21/2022.
Feb 11 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/18/2022.
Feb 22 2022Petition GRANTED.
Mar 10 2022Motion of the parties for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 22 2022Motion of the parties to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including May 13, 2022. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including July 18, 2022.
Apr 19 2022Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner Adolfo R. Arellano.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 02 2022Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner GRANTED.
May 13 2022Brief of petitioner Adolfo R. Arellano filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 19 2022Brief amici curiae of Disabled American Veterans and Lee Kirby filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 20 2022Brief amici curiae of Military-Veterans Advocacy Inc. and Jewish War Veterans of the United States of America, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 20 2022Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 20 2022Brief amicus curiae of Federal Circuit Bar Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 20 2022Brief amicus curiae of National Law School Veterans Clinic Consortium filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 20 2022Brief amici curiae of Edgewood Veterans, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 14 2022ARGUMENT SET FOR Tuesday, October, 4, 2022.
Jun 22 2022Record requested from the Federal Circuit.
Jul 06 2022The record from the U.S.C.A. Federal Circuit is electronic and located on Pacer.
Jul 18 2022Brief of respondent McDonough, Denis, Secretary of Veterans Affairs filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 19 2022The record from the U.S. Court of Appeals for Veterans Claims, has been electronically filed.
Jul 21 2022CIRCULATED
Aug 17 2022Reply of petitioner Adolfo R. Arellano filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 04 2022Argued. For petitioner: James R. Barney, Washington, D. C. For respondent: Sopan Joshi, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
James R. Barney
    Counsel of Record
Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner
901 New York Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20001

james.barney@finnegan.com
202-408-4412
Party name: Adolfo R. Arellano
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: McDonough, Denis, Secretary of Veterans Affairs
Other
Melanie Lynn Bostwick
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
1152 15th Street NW
Washington, DC 20005

mbostwick@orrick.com
202-339-8483
Party name: Military-Veterans Advocacy Inc. and Jewish War Veterans of the United States of America, Inc.
Melanie Lynn Bostwick
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
1152 15th Street NW
Washington, DC 20005

mbostwick@orrick.com
202-339-8483
Party name: Military-Veterans Advocacy Inc.
Angela K. Drake
    Counsel of Record
Veterans Clinic Univ. of Mo. School of Law
203 Hulston Hall
Columbia, MO 65211-4300

drakea@missouri.edu
573-882-7630
Party name: National Law School Veterans Clinic Consortium
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center
Jonathan Alan Herstoff
    Counsel of Record
Haug Partners LLP
745 Fifth Avenue
New York, NY 10151

jherstoff@haugpartners.com
212-588-0800
Party name: Federal Circuit Bar Association
Liam James Montgomery
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly, LLP
680 Maine Avenue S.W.
Washington, DC 20024

lmontgomery@wc.com
2024345030
Party name: Edgewood Veterans, National Veterans Organizations, et al.
Amy Frances Odom
    Counsel of Record
Chisholm Chisholm & Kilpatrick
321 S Main St
#200
Providence, RI 02903

aodom@cck-law.com
401-331-6300
Party name: Disabled American Veterans and Lee Kirby

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543