Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-430
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-430
Title:Luke T. West, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:September 21, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2019-2415)
   Decision Date:May 10, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 27 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 21, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 12 2021Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 20 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/5/2021.
Nov 08 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Claiborne Wood Brown
    Counsel of Record
Claiborne W. Brown, LLC
1070-B West Causeway Approach
Mandeville, LA 70471

cwbrown@cwbrownlaw.com
985-845-2824
Party name: Luke West
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543