Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-428
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-428
Title:Rocket Mortgage, LLC, fka Quicken Loans Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Phillip Alig, et al.
Docketed:September 21, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1059)
   Decision Date:March 10, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:April 20, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 17 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 21, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 28 2021Waiver of right of respondent Phillip Alig, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 06 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/29/2021.
Oct 12 2021Response Requested. (Due November 12, 2021)
Oct 28 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 12, 2021 to December 8, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 29 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 8, 2021.
Nov 12 2021Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 08 2021Brief of respondents Phillip Alig, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 22 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/7/2022.
Dec 22 2021Reply of petitioners Rocket Mortgage, LLC, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 10 2022Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of TransUnion LLC v. Ramirez, 594 U. S. ___ (2021).
Feb 11 2022JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
William McGinley Jay
    Counsel of Record
Goodwin Procter, LLP
1900 N Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

WJay@goodwinlaw.com
2023464190
Party name: Rocket Mortgage, LLC, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Deepak Gupta
    Counsel of Record
Gupta Wessler PLLC
2001 K Street NW
Suite 850 North
Washington, DC 20006

deepak@guptawessler.com
(202) 888-1741
Party name: Phillip Alig, et al.
Other
John Mercer Masslon II
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20036

jmasslon@wlf.org
(202) 588-0302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543