Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-421
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-421
Title:Damian R. Nastri, Petitioner
v.
Department of Homeland Security
Docketed:September 17, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2021-1015)
   Decision Date:January 21, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:April 6, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 06 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 18, 2021)
AppendixPetitionProof of Service
Oct 12 2021Waiver of right of respondent DHS to respond filed.
Main Document
Oct 20 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/5/2021.
Nov 08 2021Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Damian R. Nastri6419 Julian Street
Springfield, VA 22150

Party name: Damian R. Nastri
Attorneys for Respondent
Elizabeth B. Prelogar
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: DHS

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543