Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 21-418
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 21-418
Title:Joseph A. Kennedy, Petitioner
v.
Bremerton School District
Docketed:September 16, 2021
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(20-35222)
   Decision Date:March 18, 2021
   Rehearing Denied:July 19, 2021
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 14 2021Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 18, 2021)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 16 2021Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Joseph A. Kennedy
Blanket Consent
Sep 20 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 18, 2021 to December 7, 2021, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 21 2021Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including December 7, 2021.
Sep 27 2021Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Bremerton School District
Blanket Consent
Oct 14 2021Brief amici curiae of Former Professional Football Players Steve Largent and Chad Hennings filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 15 2021Brief amici curiae of Current State Legislators filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 18 2021Brief amicus curiae of Coach Tommy Bowden filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 18 2021Brief amici curiae of Members of Congress filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 18 2021Brief amicus curiae of Chaplain Alliance For Religious Liberty filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 18 2021Brief amicus curiae of Galen Black filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 18 2021Brief amici curiae of The Ethics and Religious Liberty Commission of the Southern Baptist Convention, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Oct 18 2021Brief amicus curiae of Pennsylvania Family Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 18 2021Brief amici curiae of Twenty-Four States filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 18 2021Brief amici curiae of Advancing American Freedom, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 07 2021Brief of respondent Bremerton School District in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 21 2021Reply of petitioner Joseph A. Kennedy filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 22 2021DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/7/2022.
Jan 10 2022DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/14/2022.
Jan 14 2022Petition GRANTED.
Jan 21 2022Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Joseph A. Kennedy
Blanket Consent
Jan 21 2022Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Bremerton School District
Blanket Consent
Feb 16 2022Brief amicus curiae of Alabama Center for Law and Liberty filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 18 2022Suggestion of mootness filed by respondent Bremerton School District. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Feb 22 2022Brief amicus curiae of Liberty Justice Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 23 2022Brief of petitioner Joseph A. Kennedy filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 23 2022Joint appendix filed (statement of costs filed).
Main Document
Feb 23 2022Brief amicus curiae of Foundation for Moral Law filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 24 2022Brief amicus curiae of American Constitutional Rights Union filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 25 2022Brief amicus curiae of Darrell Green filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 25 2022Response to Suggestion of mootness filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Feb 28 2022Reply in Support of Suggestion of Mootness filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Feb 28 2022Brief amici curiae of World Faith Foundation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2022Brief amicus curiae of Thomas More Society filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2022Brief amicus curiae of Claremont Institute's Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2022Brief amici curiae of Mountain States Legal Foundation and Southeastern Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2022Brief amici curiae of Family Policy Alliance and State Family Policy Councils filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2022Brief amici curiae of Current State Legislators filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 02 2022Brief amicus curiae of Coach Tommy Bowden filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 02 2022Brief amicus curiae of Chaplain Alliance For Religious Liberty filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 02 2022Brief amicus curiae of American Center for Law and Justice filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 02 2022Brief amicus curiae of The American Cornerstone Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 02 2022Brief amicus curiae of Galen Black filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 02 2022Brief amici curiae of Members of Congress filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 02 2022Brief amicus curiae of Liberty Counsel filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 02 2022Brief amici curiae of Former Professional Football Players Steve Largent and Chad Hennings filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 02 2022Brief amici curiae of Former Attorneys General, Edwin Meese II, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 02 2022Brief amici curiae of Kirk Cousins, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 02 2022Brief amicus curiae of Foundation for Individual Rights in Education filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 02 2022Brief amicus curiae of America First Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 02 2022Brief amici curiae of Jewish Coalition for Religious Liberty, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 02 2022Brief amicus curiae of The America First Policy Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 02 2022Brief amicus curiae of Americans for Prosperity Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 02 2022Brief amicus curiae of The American Legion filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 02 2022Brief amicus curiae of The Rutherford Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 02 2022Brief amicus curiae of United States Conference of Catholic Bishops filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 02 2022Brief amici curiae of Elisabeth P. DeVos and Defense of Freedom Institute for Policy Studies filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 02 2022Brief amici curiae of Ethics and Religious Liberty Commission of the Southern Baptist Convention filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 02 2022Brief amicus curiae of Christian Legal Society filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 02 2022Brief amici curiae of Advancing American Freedom, Young America’s Foundation, and 42 Additional Organizations and Individuals filed (3/18/22 brief and PDF to be corrected and resubmitted.)
Mar 02 2022Brief amici curiae of Advancing American Freedom, Young America's Foundation, and 39 Additional Organizations and Individuals filed. (03/24/2022). (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 02 2022Brief amici curiae of Twenty-Seven States filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 02 2022Brief amicus curiae of Notre Dame Law School Religious Liberty Initiative filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 02 2022Brief amicus curiae of Protect The First Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 15 2022ARGUMENT SET FOR Monday, April 25, 2022.
Mar 16 2022Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit.
Mar 17 2022The record from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit is electronic and located on Pacer.
Mar 23 2022CIRCULATED
Mar 25 2022Brief of respondent Bremerton School District filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 31 2022Brief amici curiae of Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 31 2022Brief amici curiae of Bremerton Community Members - BHS Football Team Alumnus, Parents, Community Leaders, and Educators filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 31 2022Brief amici curiae of Church-State Scholars filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 31 2022Brief amici curiae of Baptist Joint Committee for Religious Liberty, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 01 2022Brief amici curiae of Jo Ann Magistro and Alan Brodman filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 01 2022Brief amicus curiae of Washington State School Directors' Association filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 01 2022Brief amici curiae of American Civil Liberties Union and ACLU of Washington filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 01 2022Brief amici curiae of Forum on the Military Chaplaincy and Former Members of the Military and Military Chaplaincies filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 01 2022Brief amici curiae of Freedom From Religion Foundation, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 01 2022Brief amici curiae of New York, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 01 2022Brief amici curiae of AASA, The School Superintendents Association, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 01 2022Brief amici curiae of Former Professional Football Players Obafemi D. Ayanbadejo, Sr., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 01 2022Brief amici curiae of Religious and Denominational Organizations and Bremerton-Area Clergy filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
Apr 01 2022Brief amici curiae of Members of the U.S. House of Representatives filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 01 2022Brief amicus curiae of American Atheists, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 01 2022Brief amici curiae of Washington State Charter Schools Association and California Charter Schools Association filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 01 2022Brief amicus curiae of California School Boards Association and its Education Legal Alliance filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 01 2022Brief amici curiae of Psychology and Neuroscience Scholars filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 01 2022Brief amicus curiae of Robert D. Kamenshine filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 01 2022Brief amici curiae of National Education Association, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 01 2022Brief amici curiae of City, county, and local public employer organizations filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 01 2022Motion of City, County, and Local Public Employer Organizations for leave to participate in oral argument as amici curiae and for divided argument filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 14 2022Motion of City, County, and Local Public Employer Organizations for leave to participate in oral argument as amici curiae and for divided argument DENIED.
Apr 15 2022Reply of petitioner Joseph A. Kennedy filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 25 2022Argued. For petitioner: Paul D. Clement, Washington, D. C. For respondent: Richard B. Katskee, Washington, D. C.
Jun 27 2022Judgment REVERSED. Gorsuch, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Roberts, C. J., and Thomas, Alito, and Barrett, JJ., joined, and in which Kavanaugh, J., joined, except as to Part III–B. Thomas, J., and Alito, J., filed concurring opinions. Sotomayor, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Breyer and Kagan, JJ., joined.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

paul.clement@kirkland.com
2023895000
Party name: Joseph A. Kennedy
Attorneys for Respondent
Richard Brian Katskee
    Counsel of Record
Americans United for Separation of Church and State
1310 L Street, N.W.
Suite 200
Washington, DC 20005

katskee@au.org
2024663234
Party name: Bremerton School District
Other
James Stuart Castiglione Baehr
    Counsel of Record
609 Metairie Rd
#8162
Metairie, LA 70005

james@baehr.law
5044758407
Party name: The America First Policy Institute
Asim M. Bhansali
    Counsel of Record
Kwun Bhansali Lazarus LLP
555 Montgomery Street, Suite 750
San Francisco, CA 94111

abhansali@kblfirm.com
4156302350
Party name: Members of the U.S. House of Representatives
Geoffrey Thomas Blackwell
    Counsel of Record
American Atheists, Inc.
1201 S. Courthouse Rd.
#425
Arlington, VA 22204

legal@atheists.org
(908) 276-7300
Party name: American Atheists, Inc.
Mark Robert Bresee
    Counsel of Record
Atkinson, Andelson, Loya, Rudd & Romo
12800 Center Court Drive, Suite 300
Cerritos, CA 90703

mbresee@aalrr.com
562-653-3200
Party name: California School Boards Association and its Education Legal Alliance
Christopher Anderson Brook
    Counsel of Record
Patterson Harkavy
100 Europa Drive
Suite 420
Chapel Hill, NC 27517

cbrook@pathlaw.com
919-942-5200
Party name: Washington State Charter Schools Association, California Charter Schools Association
Anthony Thomas Caso
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Counsel Group
174 W. Lincoln Ave., #620
Anaheim, CA 92805

atcaso@ccg1776.com
916-601-1916
Party name: Claremont Institute's Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
Michael Shawn Catlett
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Arizona Attorney General
2005 N. Central Ave
Phoenix, AZ 85004

michael.catlett@azag.gov
(602) 542-5025
Party name: Twenty-Seven States
Matthew James Clark
    Counsel of Record
Alabama Center for Law and Liberty
2213 Morris Ave.
Floor 1
Birmingham, AL 35203

matt@alabamalawandliberty.org
256-510-1828
Party name: Alabama Center for Law and Liberty
Frederick W. Claybrook Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Claybrook, LLC
700 Sixth St., NW, Ste. 430
Washington, DC 20001

rick@claybrooklaw.com
202-250-3833
Party name: The Ethics and Religious Liberty Commission of the Southern Baptist Convention, et al.
Frederick W. Claybrook Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Claybrook, LLC
700 Sixth St., NW, Ste. 430
Washington, DC 20001

rick@claybrooklaw.com
202-250-3833
Party name: Ethics and Religious Liberty Commission of the Southern Baptist Convention
Steven Timothy Collis
    Counsel of Record
University of Texas School of Law
727 East Dean Keeton Street
Austin, TX 78705

steven.collis@law.utexas.edu
512-475-9090
Party name: Galen Black
Cynthia Fleming Crawford
    Counsel of Record
Americans for Prosperity Foundation
1310 N. Courthouse Road
7th Floor
Arlington, VA 22201

ccrawford@afphq.org
5713292227
Party name: Americans for Prosperity Foundation
Katherine Elizabeth Demarest
    Counsel of Record
Alaska Department of Law
1031 W. 4th Avenue, Suite 200
Anchorage, AK 99501

kate.demarest@alaska.gov
(907) 269-5172
Party name: Twenty-Four States
Michael R. Dreeben
    Counsel of Record
O’Melveny & Myers LLP
1625 I St. NW
Washington, DC 20006

mdreeben@omm.com
202-383-5400
Party name: City, County, and Local Public Employer Organizations
John Allen Eidsmoe
    Counsel of Record
Foundation for Moral Law
One Dexter Avenue
Montgomery, AL 36104

eidsmoeja@juno.com
(334) 262-1245
Party name: Foundation for Moral Law
Patrick C Elliott
    Counsel of Record
Freedom From Religion Foundation
PO BOX 750
Madison, WI 53701

pelliott@ffrf.org
6082568900
Party name: The Freedom From Religion Foundation, Center for Inquiry, American Humanist Association, and Secular Coalition for America
John Patrick Elwood
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
601 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

john.elwood@arnoldporter.com
(202) 942-5992
Party name: Chaplain Alliance For Religious Liberty
Adam Michael Foslid
    Counsel of Record
Stumphauzer Foslid Sloman Ross & Kolaya, PLLC
2 S. Biscayne Blvd.
Suite 1600
Miami, FL 33131

afoslid@sfslaw.com
(305) 614-1400
Party name: Coach Tommy Bowden
Noel John Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20001

njfrancisco@jonesday.com
(202) 879-3939
Party name: The American Legion
David Morris Gossett
    Counsel of Record
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
1301 K Street NW
Suite 500 East
Washington, DC 20005

davidgossett@dwt.com
202-973-4200
Party name: Former Professional Football Players Obafemi D. Ayanbadejo, Sr., Christopher J. Kluwe, and Frank T. Lambert, and Various Collegiate Athletes and Coaches
Douglas Harry Hallward-Driemeier
    Counsel of Record
Ropes & Gray, LLP
2099 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20006-6807

Douglas.Hallward-Driemeier@ropesgray.com
202-508-4776
Party name: Washington State School Directors' Association
Kathleen Roberta Hartnett
    Counsel of Record
Cooley LLP
3 Embarcadero Center
San Francisco, CA 94111

khartnett@cooley.com
(415) 693-2000
Party name: American Civil Liberties Union and ACLU of Washington
James L. Hirsen
    Counsel of Record
505 S. Villa Real Drive
Suite 101
Anaheim Hills, CA 92807

james@jameshirsen.com
7142838880
Party name: World Faith Foundation, et al.
Steffen Nathanael Johnson
    Counsel of Record
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati
1700 K Street, NW, Fifth Floor
Washington, DC 20006

sjohnson@wsgr.com
(202) 973-8888
Party name: Kirk Cousins, Joe DeLamielleure, Nick Foles, Phil Olsen, Christian Ponder, Drew Stanton, Harry Swayne, and Jack Youngblood
Robert D Kamenshine
    Counsel of Record
11320 Dunleith Place
North Potomac, MD 20878

rkamensh@verizon.net
301-762-7897
Party name: Robert D. Kamenshine
Ryan Anthony Kriegshauser
    Counsel of Record
Kriegshauser Ney Law Group
15050 W. 138th St., Unit 4493
Olathe, KS 66063

ryan@knlawgroup.com
913-303-0639
Party name: Current State Legislators
Harold Douglas Laycock
    Counsel of Record
University of Virginia Law School
214 Sprigg Lane
Charlottesville, VA 22903

DLAYCOCK@VIRGINIA.EDU
512-656-1789
Party name: Baptist Joint Committee for Religious Liberty, et al.
Andrew David Levy
    Counsel of Record
Brown Goldstein & Levy
120 East Baltimore Street
Suite 2500
Baltimore, MD 21202

adl@browngold.com
410-962-1030
Party name: Bremerton Community Members - BHS Football Team Alumnus, Parents, Community Leaders, and Educators
Gregory M. Lipper
    Counsel of Record
LeGrand Law PLLC
1100 H Street NW
Suite 1220
Washington, DC 20005

glipper@legrandpllc.com
(202) 996-0919
Party name: Religious and Denominational Organizations and Bremerton-Area Clergy
Matthew Theodore Martens
    Counsel of Record
WilmerHale
1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20006

matthew.martens@wilmerhale.com
202-663-6000
Party name: Elisabeth P. DeVos and Defense of Freedom Institute for Policy Studies
Joshua Adam Matz
    Counsel of Record
Kaplan Hecker & Fink LLP
1050 K Street NW
Washington, DC 20001

jmatz@kaplanhecker.com
(929) 294-2537
Party name: Church-State Scholars
Thomas Ryan McCarthy
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy PLLC
1600 Wilson Boulevard
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22209

tom@consovoymccarthy.com
7032439423
Party name: Christian Legal Society
Donald Francis McGahn II
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

DMcGahn@jonesday.com
(202) 879-3939
Party name: Members of Congress
Michael Hugh McGinley
    Counsel of Record
Dechert LLP
1900 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

michael.mcginley@dechert.com
202-261-3378
Party name: Notre Dame Law School Religious Liberty Initiative
Bruce Philip Merenstein
    Counsel of Record
Schnader Harrison Segal & Lewis LLP
1600 Market Street
Suite 3600
Philadelphia, PA 19103

bmerenstein@schnader.com
2157512249
Party name: Jo Ann Magistro and Alan Brodman
Jonathan F. Mitchell
    Counsel of Record
Mitchell Law PLLC
111 Congress Avenue
Suite 400
Austin, TX 78701

jonathan@mitchell.law
(512) 686-3940
Party name: America First Legal Foundation
Mark W. Mosier
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling, LLP
One CityCenter
850 Tenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001

mmosier@cov.com
202-662-5435
Party name: Psychology and Neuroscience Scholars
Alice Margaret O'Brien
    Counsel of Record
National Education Association
1201 16th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20036

aobrien@nea.org
202 822 7035
Party name: National Education Association et al.
John Joseph Park Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of Jack Park
P.O. Box 3073
Gainesville, GA 30503

jackparklaw@gmail.com
678-608-1920
Party name: American Constitutionals Rights Union
Maura Katherine Quinlan
    Counsel of Record
38 Golfview Road
Camp Hill, PA 17011

maurakquinlan@outlook.com
717-460-8565
Party name: Thomas More Society
Charles Rothfeld
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K St NW
Washington, DC 20006

crothfeld@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3233
Party name: AASA, The School Superintendents Association, et al.
Gene Clayton Schaerr
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr | Jaffe
1717 K Street NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

gschaerr@schaerr-jaffe.com
202-787-1060
Party name: Protect The First Foundation
Jay Alan Sekulow
    Counsel of Record
American Center for Law and Justice
201 Maryland Avenue, N.E.
Washington, DC 20002

sekulow@aclj.org
2025468890
Party name: American Center for Law and Justice
Prerak Shah
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
811 Main Street
Suite 300
Houston, TX 77002

pshah@gibsondunn.com
(214) 698-3100
Party name: Former Attorneys General, Edwin Meese II, et al.
Matthew Jared Sheehan
    Counsel of Record
Advancing American Freedom, Inc.
801 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

matt@advancingamericanfreedom.com
2027804848
Party name: Advancing American Freedom, Young America's Foundation, and 39 Additional Organizations and Individuals
Matthew Jared Sheehan
    Counsel of Record
Advancing American Freedom, Inc.
801 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

matt@advancingamericanfreedom.com
(202) 780-4848
Party name: Advancing American Freedom, Young America's Foundation, Alliance Defending Freedom, and 69 Additional Organizations and Individuals
Darpana M. Sheth
    Counsel of Record
Foundation for Individual Rights in Education
510 Walnut Street, Suite 1250
Philadelphia, PA 19106

darpana.sheth@thefire.org
215-717-3473
Party name: Foundation for Individual Rights in Education
Howard Nathan Slugh
    Counsel of Record
Jewish Coalition for Religious Liberty
2400 Virginia Ave NW
C619
Washington, DC 20037

hslugh@jcrl.org
19543289461
Party name: Jewish Coalition for Religious Liberty, et al.
Mathew D. Staver
    Counsel of Record
Liberty Counsel
PO Box 540774
Orlando, FL 32854

court@lc.org
407-875-1776
Party name: Liberty Counsel
Daniel Robert Suhr
    Counsel of Record
Liberty Justice Center
141 W. Jackson St.
Suite 1065
Chicago, IL 60604

dsuhr@libertyjusticecenter.org
312-637-2280
Party name: Liberty Justice Center
Gordon Dwyer Todd
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

gtodd@sidley.com
(202) 736-8000
Party name: Former Professional Football Players Steve Largent and Chad Hennings
Barbara Dale Underwood
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Attorney General
28 Liberty Street
New York, NY 10005-1400

Barbara.underwood@ag.ny.gov
212-416-8020
Party name: States of New York, California, Delaware, Hawai‘i, Illinois, Maine, Maryland, Massachusetts, Michigan, Minnesota, New Jersey, New Mexico, and Oregon, and the District of Columbia
William Wagner
    Counsel of Record
Great Lakes Justice Center
5600 W. Mount Hope Hwy.
Upper Level
Lansing, MI 48917

Prof.WWJD@gmail.com
517-643-1765
Party name: Darrell Green
Edward Mark Wenger
    Counsel of Record
Holtzman Vogel Baran Torchinsky & Josefiak PLLC
2300 N Street, NW
Suite 643A
Washington, DC 20037

emwenger@HoltzmanVogel.com
2027378808
Party name: The American Cornerstone Institute
Randall L. Wenger
    Counsel of Record
Independence Law Center
23 N. Front Street, First Floor
Harrisburg, PA 17101

rwenger@indlawcenter.org
717-657-4990
Party name: Family Policy Alliance and State Family Policy Councils
Randall L. Wenger
    Counsel of Record
Independence Law Center
23 N. Front Street, First Floor
Harrisburg, PA 17101

rwenger@indlawcenter.org
717-657-4990
Party name: Pennsylvania Family Institute
John W. Whitehead
    Counsel of Record
The Rutherford Institute
109 Deerwood Road
Charlottesville, VA 22911

legal@rutherford.org
4349783888
Party name: The Rutherford Institute
Lori Halstead Windham
    Counsel of Record
The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty
1919 Pennsylvania Ave. NW
Suite 400
Washington, DC 20006

lwindham@becketlaw.org
202-349-7202
Party name: United States Conference of Catholic Bishops
Cody James Wisniewski
    Counsel of Record
Mountain States Legal Foundation
2596 S. Lewis Way
Lakewood, CO 80227

cody@mslegal.org
303-292-2021
Party name: Mountain States Legal Foundation and Southeastern Legal Foundation
Jonathan K. Youngwood
    Counsel of Record
Simpson Thacher & Bartlett, LLP
425 Lexington Avenue
New York, NY 10017

JYoungwood@STBLAW.com
2124553539
Party name: Forum on the Military Chaplaincy and Former Members of the Military and Military Chaplaincies
Thomas A. Zaccaro
    Counsel of Record
Paul Hastings LLP
515 South Flower Street
Los Angeles, CA 90071

thomaszaccaro@paulhastings.com
2136836185
Party name: Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc., Human Rights Campaign, COLAGE, Family Equality California, GLSEN, Keshet, PFLAG, Equality California

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543